EXCO Operating Company, L.P. v. Evelyn Arnold, et al
Original Case: 3:10-cv-01838
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-pcd-31043 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2013 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 04, 2015 6:28 PM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
LLOYD TURNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
AUDREY BURNS DUCHENE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HARRY JAMES ZEHNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TYREE WAYNE TURNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
EDDIE RAY TURNER, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HEZEKIAH TURNER, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FREDERICK VAUGHN TURNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BARBARA BURNS ROBINSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLES EDWARD PIERCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROMIE DENISE MORRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SIBON PIERCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DELESHA DAWN BURNS MAHONEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ET AL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ARVETTA TURNER COLEMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GRETA TURNER BURTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LATAISHA ROCHELLE BURNS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARISSA BUTLER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PATRICE EBONY BURNS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES EARL BURNS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
J'LYSHAE G. BURNS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THEODORE ARNOLD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
EVELYN ARNOLD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
EXCO OPERATING COMPANY, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 04 2014
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-31043 Affirmed ] Judge: TMR , Judge: EHJ , Judge: ECP Mandate pull date is 09/25/2014 [13-31043] |