Hillman et al v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00199 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 28, 2018 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Donald Hillman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Hillman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/28 10:00 AM
Order Granting Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/13/2021.(jrm) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
minutes
Status Hearing
Mon 04/20 2:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Status Hearing held on 4/20/2020. Order to follow. (Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney Timothy Becker). (Defendant Attorney Paul Boehm, Barry Boise, Amy Laurendeau, Raymond Williams). (Judge Highberger).Associated Cases: 3:13-md-02452-AJB-MDD et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (lrf) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 10/26 4:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2018. Matter submitted. Status Conference set for 11/1/2018 01:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney Max Kimberly). (Defendant Attorney Amy Laurendaeau; Raymond Williams; Paul Boehm). Associated Cases: 3:13-md-02452-AJB-MDD et al.(no document attached) (gac) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/29 1:51 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/29 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Related to MDL Case - 2452. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10857840), filed by Donald Hillman, Mary Hillman. The new case number is 3:18-cv-199-AJB-MDD. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Goldstein, Brian)(jms) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |