QS Holdco Inc. v. Bank Of America Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00824 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade) |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 29, 2018 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Prime Securities Services (USA) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Securities LLC
1285 Avenue of the America
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Financial Services Inc.
1000 Harbor Blvd.
Weehawken, NJ 07086 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Americas Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Strategic Investments I, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Prime Dealer Services Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EquiLend LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Next Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
11 Madison Avenue 24th Floor
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EquiLend Europe Limited
|
|
Defendant
EquiLend Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Lynch L.P. Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P.
200 West Street
New York, NY 10282 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldman, Sachs & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
QS Holdco Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Morgan Stanley
Terminated: 04/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Group AG
Terminated: 04/18/2018
|
|
Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Terminated: 04/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC
Terminated: 04/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank Of America Corporation
Terminated: 04/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Group AG
Terminated: 04/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Terminated: 04/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |