Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Alloy Welding, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00221 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 30, 2018 2:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alloy Welding, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Robert Gutierrez
|
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the International Training Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 11/25 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notices to Release Levy36 ,37 were docketed in error. These documents will be re-docketed to the correct case number 5:18-cv-02212 DSF (SPx). (jp) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/25 3:40 PM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED DATED ON 11/25/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO.38 ] - NOTICE TO RELEASE LEVY by US Marshals Service as to Lendlease (US) Construction, Inc. (jp). Modified on 11/25/2020 (jp) |
|
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/25 3:38 PM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED DATED ON 11/25/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO.38 ] - NOTICE TO RELEASE LEVY by US. Marshals Service. (jp) Modified on 11/25/2020 (jp) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Thu 08/27 9:53 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re Judgment,,22 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Jung, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
service
USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed
Thu 07/18 3:50 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) Bank Levy returned executed upon Alloy Welding, Inc., Robert Gutierrez on 6/29/19. Remarks: mailed on 6/30/19. (twdb) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Writ Issued
Fri 06/14 9:35 AM
WRIT of of Execution issued [alias]. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
Thu 06/13 3:12 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund.(Moorhead, J) |
|
Att: 1 Writ of Execution Alias | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
service
USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed
Fri 03/08 2:36 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed upon Alaska USA Federal Credit Union, Inc. on 1/30/2019 of Levy. Remarks: mailed 1/30/2019. (yl) |
|
30 | 30
service
USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed
Fri 03/08 2:31 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed upon Alaska USA federal credit union on 1/30/2019 of Levy. Remarks: mailed 1/30/2019. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 02/26 11:32 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J Paul Moorhead counsel for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. Adding J. Paul Moorhead as counsel of record for Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, et al.. (Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the International Training Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund(pty:pla))(Moorhead, J) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
For Order
Fri 11/16 8:28 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting25 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Service of Process by Registered Process Server. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Writ of Execution - Issued
Tue 11/06 1:19 PM
Writ of Execution issued against Alloy Welding, Inc., Robert Gutierrez an individual dba Alloy Wellding, re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution,26 . (twdb) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
Mon 11/05 1:24 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution re: Judgment,,22 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund.(Moorhead, J) |
|
Att: 1 Writ of Execution | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 11/05 10:35 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Service of Process by Registered Process Server filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Y. Jung, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Order for Service of Process by Registered Process Server | ||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Abstract of Judgment issued
Thu 10/04 11:26 AM
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of plaintiffs Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund and against Alloy Welding, Inc., Robert Gutierrez in the principal amount of $ 38,511.16, interest in the amount of $ 00, attorneys fees of $ 5,702.90, costs of $ 685.00. RE: Judgment,22 . (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 09/25 9:56 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, re Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,21 served on September 25, 2018. (Jung, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 09/21 5:55 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Pursuant to the Order21 filed concurrently herewith, Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment against Alloy Welding, Inc., and Robert Gutierrez, an individual dba "Alloy Welding," is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are AWARDED $33,671.16 in monetary damages; $200.00 in late filing fees; $4,640.00 in audit fees; $5,702.90 in attorneys fees; and $685.00 in costs under ERISA. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs mail a copy of this judgment and the Order concurrently filed therewith to Defendants. Plaintiffs shall file Proof of Service with the Court within ten days of the date of the Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Default Judgment
Fri 09/21 1:09 PM
MINUTES Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt. No.14 ); and (2) VACATING the 9/24/2018 Hearing (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for default judgment. Judgment shall be entered as follows: (1) As to Plaintiffs ERISA claim, Plaintiffs are AWARDED: a. $18,377.22 in unpaid contributionsb. $7,646.97 in interest; c. $7,646.97 in double interest instead of liquidated damages; d. $200.00 in late filing fees; e. $4,640.00 in audit fees; f. $5,702.90 in attorneys fees; g. $685.00 in costs. (2) Plaintiffs are ORDERED to mail a copy of this order and the judgment concurrently filed therewith to Defendant. Plaintiffs shall file Proof of Service with the Court within ten days of the date of this Order. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 08/22 11:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc. and Robert Gutierrez14 served on August 22, 2018. (Jung, Michael) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Wed 08/22 11:08 AM
DECLARATION of Michael Y. Jung in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc. and Robert Gutierrez14 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund.(Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - B | ||
18 | 18
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Wed 08/22 11:06 AM
DECLARATION of Ronald Chandler in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc. and Robert Gutierrez14 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund.(Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
17 | 17
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Wed 08/22 11:04 AM
DECLARATION of Angelo Nicodemo in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc. and Robert Gutierrez14 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund.(Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
16 | 16
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Wed 08/22 11:03 AM
DECLARATION of Renae E. Mac Donald in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc. and Robert Gutierrez14 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund.(Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - D, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit E - G, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit H - O | ||
15 | 15
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 08/22 10:59 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc. and Robert Gutierrez14 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Jung, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 08/22 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc. and Robert Gutierrez filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment | ||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/16 1:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause re: Lack of Prosecution by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause in writing no later than August 24, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Fri 05/04 2:18 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Alloy Welding Inc, a California corporation and Robert Gutierrez, an individual doing business as Alloy Welding. (ad) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Wed 05/02 2:38 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc., Robert Gutierrez filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Y. Jung | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/06 10:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, upon Defendant Robert Gutierrez served on 4/4/2018, answer due 4/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Gutierrez, an individual doing business as "Alloy Welding" in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jung, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/06 10:44 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, upon Defendant Alloy Welding, Inc. served on 4/4/2018, answer due 4/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Gutierrez - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jung, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 02/05 4:20 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 02/01 11:36 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Alloy Welding, Inc., Robert Gutierrez. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 02/01 11:30 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 02/01 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 01/31 12:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Jung, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 01/31 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, (Jung, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 01/31 12:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Jung, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/31 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21187696 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the International Training Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund(pty:pla))(Jung, Michael) |