Sonya Weaver-Johnson v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-00175 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 30, 2018 2:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonya Weaver-Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Fri 02/16 10:28 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court, Central Justice Center. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court, Central Justice Center. (lwag) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/16 10:24 AM
ORDER Granting Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court9 by Judge David O. Carter: Pursuant to Local Rules 7-1 and 52-4.1, the Court has reviewed the Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court and hereby orders as follows:The Action shall be remanded to State Court in accordance with the partiesstipulation. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) |
|
12 | 12
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Fri 02/16 9:22 AM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as SACV18-00175 DOC (DFMx). (lwag) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Thu 02/15 3:50 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as SACV 18-00175 CJC (DFMx). (dv) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Thu 02/15 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:18-cv-00175 JVS(DFMx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Remand Case to State Court
Wed 02/14 2:07 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Preece, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Thu 02/01 4:45 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 01/31 5:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., re Jury Demand5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Declaration,3 served on 01/31/18. (Preece, Alexandra) |
|
5 | 5
trial
Jury Demand
Wed 01/31 5:49 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Preece, Alexandra) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 01/31 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., identifying Home Depot, Inc.. (Preece, Alexandra) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 01/31 5:46 PM
DECLARATION of Alexandra L. Preece re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Movant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Preece, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 01/31 5:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Preece, Alexandra) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/31 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2017 00924614-CU-PO-CJC Receipt No: 0973-21191285 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attorney Alexandra Lee Preece added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Preece, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 02/01 4:39 PM
CONFORMED COPY COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sonya Weaver-Johnson. Filed as attachment 1 to Document 3 Declaration of Alexandra L Preece (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 02/01 4:41 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Filed as attachment 3 to Doc. 3 Declaration of of Alexandra L. Preece.(car) |