Hatchett v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard W Story |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00522 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 01, 2018 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jana Hatchett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
51 | 51
30+
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 12/14 12:58 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' ( 801 ) Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (MDL 2782, 1:17-md-2782). The court ORDERS that: 1. the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is GRANTED; and 2. the Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the actions listed on the attached Exhibit A; 3. if there are no remaining defendants in a civil action, then (a) that civil action is dismissed with prejudice and stricken from the docket and (b) any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/13/2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(rsg) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/16 7:44 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (lwb) |