Dominique Ford-Sholebo v. USA
Original Case: 1:09-cv-02287
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-03450 |
Type | civil / us |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2013 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 5:36 PM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DOMINIQUE FORD-SHOLEBO, Individually and as administrator of the estate of Habib Solebo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/10/2016 4:25 PM CST |
Friday, November 01, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 U.S. civil case docketed. U.S. Appeal. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/15/2013. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/11/2013 for United States of America. Record on Appeal from Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division due by 11/22/2013. [1] [6528014] 13-3450 (ER) |