Great Oak NC Lender, LLC v. Marshall Cornblum
Original Case: 2:12-cv-00034
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv.pr-02351 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Case Filed: | Nov 04, 2013 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2013 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 6:51 PM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
MARSHALL E. CORNBLUM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MADELINE H. CORNBLUM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL CORNBLUM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CAROLYN CORNBLUM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LONGBRANCH PROPERTIES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor/Plaintiff - Appellant
GREAT OAK NC LENDER, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASSET HOLDING COMPANY 5, LLC, as assignee of other, United Community Bank (Georgia)
|
Docket last updated: 01/10/2016 5:49 PM EST |
Monday, November 04, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-00034-MR-DLH. Case manager: JMoore. 13-2351 (JHM) | |
2 | 2 ORDER filed [999233187] consolidating case 13-2351 with 13-2350 . Copies to all parties.. 13-2350 13-2351 (JHM) | |
3 | 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [999233163-2] case docketed , [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-00069-MR.. 13-2350 13-2351 (JHM) | |
4 | 4 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/16/2013. Response Brief due 01/16/2014 13-2350 13-2351 (JHM) |