ROGERS et al v. GREWAL et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01544 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 04, 2018 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
KENNETH J. BROWN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PATRICK J. CALLAHAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
N. PETER CONFORTI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GURBIR GREWAL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOSEPH W. OXLEY
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV JOHN D. OHLENDORF
|
|
Notice Only
PHV PETER A. PATTERSON
|
|
Notice Only
PHV DAVID H. THOMPSON
|
|
Plaintiff
ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS R. ROGERS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/18 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICCI J. WEISS on behalf of KENNETH J. BROWN, JR (WEISS, MICCI) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal)
Mon 10/15 8:54 AM
MANDATE of USCA granting motion for summary action as to28 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS (Finance notified) (ca3cjg) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned)
Thu 06/21 6:33 PM
USCA Case Number 18-2366 for28 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS. USCA Case Manager Carmella (Document Restricted - Court Only)(ca3cw, ) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia)
Mon 06/18 7:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to27 Order on Motion to Dismiss,26 Opinion by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-8821303. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 05/21 12:26 PM
ORDER that Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/21/2018. (mmh) |
|
26 | 26
8
pgs
order
Opinion
Mon 05/21 12:24 PM
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/21/2018. (mmh) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/14 2:57 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY re16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer ,18 MOTION to Dismiss (LUCAS, BRYAN) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/26 11:51 AM
LETTER ORDER that the pending Motion to Dismiss is adjourned to 5/21/2018. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/26/2018. (mmh) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/26 11:52 AM
Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer . Motion reset for 5/21/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Wed 04/25 11:06 AM
Letter from Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C., and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C. (LUCAS, BRYAN) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/23 5:11 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS re16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer ,18 MOTION to Dismiss (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Thu 04/12 9:20 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID H. THOMPSON, PETER A. PATTERSON and JOHN D. OHLENDORF, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Wed 04/11 7:56 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John D. Ohlendorf to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Wed 04/11 7:55 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Peter A. Patterson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Wed 04/11 7:53 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David H. Thompson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/11 8:34 AM
Set Deadlines as to18 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Wed 04/11 11:14 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee OF $150 received as to John D. Ohlendorf, Esq., receipt number TRE090659. (jem) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Wed 04/11 11:16 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to David H. Thompson, Esq., Peter A. Patterson, Esq., receipt number TRE090658. (jem) |
||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/10 9:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by KENNETH J. BROWN, JR. Responses due by 4/23/2018(LASALLE, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/05 4:12 PM
ORDER Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to David H. Thompson, Peter A. Patterson, and John D. Ohlendorf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/5/2018. (km) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/03 12:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer by PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY. Responses due by 4/23/2018(LUCAS, BRYAN) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Form of Order, | ||
Att: 3 Brief | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/03 3:58 PM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/28 3:45 PM
CONSENT ORDER that Defendant Kenneth J. Brown, Jr. be permitted to respond to the Complaint by 4/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/27/2018. (mmh) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/27 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL L LASALLE on behalf of KENNETH J. BROWN, JR (LASALLE, PAUL) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Tue 03/27 2:17 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by KENNETH J. BROWN, JR.(LASALLE, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/05 1:28 PM
CONSENT ORDER that Defendants Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C. and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C. are permitted to respond to the Complaint for an additional period of 21 days or no later than 4/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/5/2018. (mmh) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 03/02 1:39 PM
Letter from Defendants Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C., and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C.. (LUCAS, BRYAN) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/22 7:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. N. PETER CONFORTI served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/22 7:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. KENNETH J. BROWN, JR served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/22 7:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. PATRICK J. CALLAHAN served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/22 7:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. JOSEPH W. OXLEY served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/22 7:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. GURBIR GREWAL served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/22 7:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Gurbir Grewal on 2/6/2018, filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 02/16 9:45 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by JOSEPH W. OXLEY, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, GURBIR GREWAL, N. PETER CONFORTI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/13/2018. (mmh) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 02/15 4:26 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C., and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C.. Attorney BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for PATRICK J. CALLAHAN,BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for N. PETER CONFORTI,BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for GURBIR GREWAL,BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for JOSEPH W. OXLEY added. (LUCAS, BRYAN) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/05 2:37 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KENNETH J. BROWN, JR, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/05 12:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/05 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT against KENNETH J. BROWN, JR, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8453532), filed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC..(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 02/05 2:33 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem) |