Perry v. Kriegman
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas O Rice |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 04, 2018 1:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bruce P Kriegman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Perry
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
9CCA Mandate
Thu 08/01 4:34 PM
MANDATE from 9CCA as to15 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Perry. Appeal is Dismissed. 9CCA: 19-35123 (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Thu 05/09 2:03 PM
ORDER: BEFORE THE COURT is Mr. Perry's Motion to Reopen, ECF No. 25 (although not captioned a motion to reopen, Mr. Perry is an ECF filer and choose to classify his filing as such). As evidenced by Mr. Perry's filings in the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals in case number 19-35123 see ECF No. 25-1, this Court does not have jurisdiction to proceed. The Motion to Reopen, ECF No.25 , is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Reopen Case
Wed 04/24 9:36 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by David Perry. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Perry, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Clarify
Thu 04/18 8:11 AM
ORDER: BEFORE THE COURT is Mr. Perrys Motion for Clarification ECF No.23 . The filing of a notice of appeal... confers jurisdiction on the court of appeals while divesting the district court of its control over those aspects of the case involved in the appeal. Rodriguez v. Cnty. of L.A., 891 F.3d 776, 790 (9th Cir. 2018). Accordingly, the Motion for Clarification is DENIED. This file in the District Court remains closed. TEXT ONLY ORDER/NO PDF DOCUMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Clarify
Wed 03/20 2:53 PM
MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND REINSTATEMENT OF APPEAL IN PROPER COURT by David Perry. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 02/27 11:39 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. For reasons that are unnecessary to recite here, it has been determined that this case should be reassigned to Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice for all further proceedings. The parties are directed to change the initials on the case number from RMP to TOR on all future pleadings to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE.(BF, Paralegal) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/27 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Gibbons on behalf of Bruce P Kriegman (Attorney Daniel J Gibbons added to party Bruce P Kriegman(pty:dft))(Gibbons, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Wed 02/27 9:25 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL OF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE ROSANNA MALOUF PETERSON. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Tue 02/26 10:54 AM
Letter from Plaintiff David Perry to Judge Peterson dated February 22, 2019. (MS, Judicial Assistant) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
9CCA Time Schedule
Fri 02/15 12:04 PM
9CCA Appeal Time Schedule and Case Number: 19-35123 RE: APPEAL FEES for15 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Perry. Opening Brief Due: 4/12/2019. Appellees Brief Due: 5/13/2019. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Letter - Appeal
Mon 02/11 12:38 PM
Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to David Perry dated 2/11/2019(TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet | ||
16 | 16
appeal
9CCA Payment Notification
Mon 02/11 12:35 PM
9CCA Payment Notification form re15 Notice of Appeal. Fee Not Paid. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
9CCA Notice of Appeal - Amended
Thu 02/07 8:41 PM
9CCA AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to14 Order Dismissing Case, by David Perry. 9CCA: 16-cv-43.(Perry, David) |
|
Att: 1 Reinstatement of Appeal | ||
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/24 10:18 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AND DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; denying ECF Nos.5 Motion to Stay and12 Motion for Clarification and Appointment of Counsel. FILE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Certiorari Document
Mon 11/19 4:02 PM
Letter from Supreme Court received and placed on docket re the Petition for rehearing is denied as to 18-92 (9CCA Nos. 15-35976 15-3585 received. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Clarify
Tue 06/05 10:27 PM
MOTION to Clarify re9 Notice,5 MOTION to Stay,6 Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing by David Perry. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Perry, David) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Bankruptcy - Notice of Docketing
Thu 05/03 2:35 PM
Notice of Docketing BK No: 09-06194 FPC11. Please be advised that the Clerk of the United States District Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court a Certificate of Record in this case. In accordance with FRBP 8007(b), this serves as a notice of docketing this appeal. Parties are to submit their briefs in accordance with FRBP 8009 as modified by Eastern District LR 83.5 (b) (3). s/ SEAN F. McAVOY, Clerk of Court (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Bankruptcy - Certificate of Record
Thu 05/03 12:03 PM
Certificate of Record received from Bankruptcy Court. (KM, USBC) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice - For Miscellaneous Use
Wed 04/25 11:52 AM
REQUEST CONTINUATION OF STAY re ECF No.5 Motion for Stay filed by David Perry. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Obtain ECF Login and Password
Wed 04/18 4:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING ECF No.7 MOTION FOR CM/ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/18/2018) (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Obtain ECF Login and Password (Pro Se Filer Only)
Wed 04/18 11:31 AM
MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password by David Perry. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing
Tue 04/03 4:39 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON5 MOTION TO STAY. Motion Hearing re ECF No.5 reset for 6/22/2018 without oral argument (cc: David Perry via U.S. Mail and Email). Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Mon 04/02 3:28 PM
MOTION to Stay by David Perry. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2018 at 6:30 PM without oral argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/02 3:12 PM
AMENDED STATUS REPORT OF APPEAL TO THE APPELLATE COURT from U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Eastern District of Washington (cc: David Perry via U.S. Mail). (PL, Case Administrator) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/28 4:45 PM
STATUS REPORT OF APPEAL TO APPELLATE COURT from U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Eastern District of Washington. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing
Mon 02/05 3:53 PM
Notice of Filing BK No: 09-06194 FPC11 Pursuant to a notice from the USBAP/USBC, a party to the captioned appeal has timely filed an objection to the disposition of this matter by the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel. As a result of that objection, the matter is transferred to the US District Court. All future pleadings related to this appeal must be filed in this Court with the exception of the Statement of Issues and the Designation of Record. These two documents are to be filed in the Bankruptcy Clerk's Office. To date, no Certificate of Record has been received from the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington.* Until that Certificate is received, the time limits imposed by FRBP 8009, as modified by Eastern District LR 83.5(b)(3), shall not commence to run. After the Certificate of Record is received by this Court, the Clerk will issue a Notice of Docketing that will trigger the briefing schedule. If a Certificate of Record is not received within ninety (90) days of this Notice, this Court will issue an Order directing the parties to show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed. s/ SEAN F. McAVOY, Clerk of Court TEXT ENTRY - No PDF Document *Pursuant to FRBP 8006, it is the responsibility of the parties to monitor the progress of securing the portions of the record necessary for the disposition of the appeal. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Mon 02/05 12:54 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 09-06194 FPC11. Filed by David Perry.(KM, USBC) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 02/05 3:49 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) |