SPENCER v. C.R. BARD, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martini |
Referred: | Mark Falk |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01692 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 06, 2018 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
C.R. BARD, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVOL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS SPENCER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark (public)
Fri 08/10 8:24 AM
Remark:Case transferred from New Jerseyhas been opened in Southern District of Ohioas case 2:18-cv-00822, filed 08/09/2018. (gh, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Tue 08/07 2:35 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of Ohio. (MDL 2846 Judge Edmund A. Sargus) (gh, ) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Tue 08/07 2:36 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of Ohio. (gh, ) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/19 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHANA EVE RUSSO on behalf of C.R. BARD, INC., DAVOL, INC. (RUSSO, SHANA) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 04/20 3:48 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Stay. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed from today through 90 days after the JPML hearing. The parties are to file a joint status report 90 days from the date of a JPML hearing on this matter, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/20/18. (cm, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/20 2:48 PM
Set Deadlines as to7 Consent MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 5/21/2018 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Wed 04/18 5:17 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay by C.R. BARD, INC., DAVOL, INC..(WINTERS, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit The MDL Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit MDL Motion Supporting Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Second Amended Schedule of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Order dated April 18, 2018, Ochoa v. C.R. Bard, Inc., et al, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/06 2:53 PM
Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by C.R. BARD, INC., DAVOL, INC..(WINTERS, DANIEL) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/06 2:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. BARD, INC., DAVOL, INC.. (WINTERS, DANIEL) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/27 5:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS SPENCER. DAVOL, INC. served on 2/13/2018, answer due 3/6/2018. (KINCANNON, JOSHUA) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/21 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS SPENCER. C.R. BARD, INC. served on 2/13/2018, answer due 3/6/2018. (KINCANNON, JOSHUA) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/07 2:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.R. BARD, INC., DAVOL, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/07 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT against C.R. BARD, INC., DAVOL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8460612) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THOMAS SPENCER.(KINCANNON, JOSHUA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/07 12:07 PM
Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (ak, ) Modified on 2/7/2018 (ak) |