J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Peroles LLC et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Victor A Bolden |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00243 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:0553 Unauthorized reception of signal |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 07, 2018 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jaider A. Osorno
|
|
Defendant
Dario Osorno-Marin
|
|
Defendant
Peroles LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
950 South Bascom, Suite 3010
San Jose, CA 95128 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
order
Writ of Garnishment
Fri 07/09 8:48 AM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued (Imbriani, Susan) |
|
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Application for Writ of Garnishment
Thu 07/08 1:25 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
order
Writ of Garnishment
Thu 02/04 9:02 AM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued (Imbriani, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Application for Writ of Garnishment
Wed 02/03 2:20 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Writ Issued
Wed 05/15 1:53 PM
WRIT of Garnishment issued. (Fazekas, J.) (Fazekas, J.) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server
Wed 05/01 2:00 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/1/2019. (Washington, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Appointment of Special Process Server
Mon 04/29 1:38 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Application for Writ of Garnishment
Mon 04/29 1:36 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Wed 01/23 4:10 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.) |
||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
15
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 01/18 5:17 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/18/2019. (Washington, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 01/16 2:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2019 re12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to PEROLES LLC, JAIDER A. OSORNO A/K/A JAIDER A. OSORNO-ARANGO AND DARIO OSORNO-MARIN filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Total Time: 0 hours and 9 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Washington, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
trial
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Tue 01/15 6:33 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. re 17 Calendar Entry,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings,. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Calendar Entry Set Deadlines/Hearings Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/09 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM January 16, 2019 Default Judgment Hearing at 11:00 a.m. Hearing now set for 1/16/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Washington, Gregory) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 01/09 9:48 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/9/2019. (Washington, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Continue
Tue 01/08 2:51 PM
First MOTION to Continue Hearing Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment (Doc. Id. 12) by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Calendar Entry Set Deadlines/Hearings Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 12/21 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion hearing for12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to PEROLES LLC, JAIDER A. OSORNO A/K/A JAIDER A. OSORNO-ARANGO AND DARIO OSORNO-MARIN on 1/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Washington, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 10/18 4:10 PM
ORDER finding as moot11 Motion for Extension of Time11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/15/2018 to file Motion for Judgment (Rule 55(b)) 10 Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/18/2018. (Washington, Gregory) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 06/08 2:58 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to PEROLES LLC, JAIDER A. OSORNO A/K/A JAIDER A. OSORNO-ARANGO AND DARIO OSORNO-MARIN by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/01 2:25 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/15/2018 to file Motion for Judgment (Rule 55(b)) 10 Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)
Tue 05/01 12:12 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as to Peroles LLC, Jaider A. Osorno a/k/a Jaider A. Osorno-Arango and Dario Osorno-Mari. Motion for default judgment due by 5/31/2018. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2018. (Perez, J.) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Entry 55(a)
Fri 04/27 11:05 AM
MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Peroles LLC, Jaider A. Osorno a/k/a Jaider A. Osorno-Arango and Dario Osorno-Marin by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/21 12:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Jaider A. Osorno served on 3/21/2018, answer due 4/11/2018; Dario Osorno-Marin served on 3/21/2018, answer due 4/11/2018; Peroles LLC served on 3/21/2018, answer due 4/11/2018. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 03/07 1:01 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jaider A. Osorno, Dario Osorno-Marin, Peroles LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel M. Jolles* * J & J Sports Productions, Inc.represented byJoel M. Jolles Law Office of Joel M. Jolles* *51 Funaro Road* *Hamden, CT 06514*. (Perez, J.) |
|
Sunday, March 04, 2018 | ||
service
Request to Issue Summons
Sun 03/04 11:36 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Jaider A. Osorno, Dario Osorno-Marin, Peroles LLC. (Jolles, Joel) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Electronic Service Documents
Fri 02/09 4:54 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,5 Protective Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.,2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/2018.(Oliver, T.) |
|
5 | 5
order
Protective Order
Fri 02/09 4:52 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/8/2018.(Oliver, T.) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Electronic Filing Order
Fri 02/09 4:52 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/8/2018.(Oliver, T.) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Fri 02/09 4:51 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 5/8/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2018 Discovery due by 8/10/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2018 Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2018. (Oliver, T.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/08 5:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Jolles, Joel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/08 5:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Jaider A. Osorno, Dario Osorno-Marin, Peroles LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4713286.), filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc..(Jolles, Joel) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 02/09 9:35 AM
Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) |