Beale v. Wallace Gallery et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eric N Vitaliano |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00871 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 07, 2018 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
Terry Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wallace Gallery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bouvier Beale, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/04 2:39 PM
ENDORSED ORDER ON DOCUMENT #16 DISMISSING CASE, Application Granted. That this action shall be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/31/19) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/31 6:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Bouvier Beale, Jr (Noh, Megan) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion Memorandum in Support
Fri 06/22 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 Memorandum in Opposition,8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , REPLY to Response to Motion re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Terry Wallace, Wallace Gallery. (Wengrovsky, Todd) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/01 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Noh on behalf of Bouvier Beale, Jr (aty to be noticed) (Noh, Megan) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/01 4:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bouvier Beale, Jr. (Noh, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
12 | 12
24
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 06/01 4:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bouvier Beale, Jr. (Noh, Megan) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 05/04 10:36 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Russo, Eric) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/27 10:30 AM
Electronic ORDER granting11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The parties' stipulated schedule is So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/27/2018. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/26 2:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Bouvier Beale, Jr. (Cahill, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
10
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 04/17 7:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Terry Wallace, Wallace Gallery. (Wengrovsky, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
9 | 9
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 04/17 7:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Affidavit of Terry Wallace filed by Terry Wallace, Wallace Gallery. (Wengrovsky, Todd) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/17 7:09 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Terry Wallace, Wallace Gallery. (Wengrovsky, Todd) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/05 7:56 AM
Electronic ORDER finding as moot7 request for pre-motion conference. This Court does not require pre-motion conferences for motions to dismiss. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/5/2018. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/04 3:38 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt. Judge Leonard D. Wexler no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Kramer, Michael) |
||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/02 9:36 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Terry Wallace, Wallace Gallery. (Wengrovsky, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/27 10:42 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application granted. The time for defendant to respond to the complaint is extended through April 2, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/27/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/26 1:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, / Signed Stipulation by Terry Wallace, Wallace Gallery. (Wengrovsky, Todd) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/12 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Wengrovsky, Todd) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/09 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Terry Wallace, Wallace Gallery. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 02/09 10:35 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 02/09 10:33 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 02/09 10:35 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/08 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10186389 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Bouvier Beale, Jr. (Cahill, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons |