Zouvas et al v. Greenfield Farms Food Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00445 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 07, 2018 1:41 AM MST |
Defendant
Edward Carter
12019 Humboldt Dr.
Charlotte, NC 28277 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greenfield Farms Food Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NGEN Technologies USA Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NOHO Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke C Zouvas
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ronald Heineman
Terminated: 12/29/2017
|
|
Defendant
Ronald E Heineman
Terminated: 04/20/2018
|
|
Defendant
Jason Koo
Terminated: 04/20/2018
|
|
Defendant
David Lithwick
Terminated: 04/20/2018
|
|
Defendant
Clifford Rhee Rhee
Terminated: 12/29/2017
|
|
Defendant
Clifford M Rhee
Terminated: 04/20/2018
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Terminated: 04/20/2018
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Clerks Judgment
Fri 06/01 10:45 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed June 1, 2018, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (DXD) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/01 10:43 AM
ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and comply with the Court's Order. The Clerk shall enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice and terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/31/18. (DXD) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 04/24 2:35 PM
ORDER that Plaintiffs must show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed in its entirety for failure to prosecute no later than May 1, 2018, unless a responsive pleading pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is filed within such time. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/24/18. (CLB) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 04/20 5:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to12 Order regarding service time frame required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), Defendants David Lithwick, Clifford M Rhee, Unknown Parties, Ronald E Heineman and Jason Koo are terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 02/28 11:18 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark David Hunter of Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC is withdrawn as counsel of record and relieved of any and all further obligations for Defendants Ngen Technologies USA Corp., Greenfield Farms Food, Inc., and Edward Carter. The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket (per Doc.13 ) to reflect the mailing address of Edward Carter. Defendants shall have until March 14, 2018 to obtain new counsel. Attorney Mark David Hunter shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants and file proof of service with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/28/18. (EJA) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
5
pgs
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/16 9:38 AM
EX PARTE MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward Carter, Greenfield Farms Food Incorporated, NGEN Technologies USA Corporation.(Hunter, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
8
pgs
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 02/09 3:04 PM
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on March 19, 2018, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/9/18.(CLB) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Thu 02/08 12:43 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/08 12:42 PM
Letter Re Transfer of 3:17-cv-2575-CAB (WCG) from Southern District of California to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-18-445-PHX-SPL. (MAP) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 02/08 12:05 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-02575 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 Case transferred to District of Arizona. Files transferred electronically to: *District of District of Arizona*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/1/2018. (jjg) (sjt). [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Order | ||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Mark David Hunter . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/16/2018.(jrd) [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER to Show Cause Re Venue and Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. No5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/16/2018. (jjg) [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re Preliminary Injunction by Luke C. Zouvas.(Zouvas, Luke) (jjg). [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of David Mersky, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Luke C. Zouvas, Esq. | ||
4 | 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10804806.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hunter, Mark) (kcm). [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jjg) [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand NOHO, INC. and Luke Zouvas against Clifford Rhee Rhee, Edward Carter, Jason Koo, David Lithwick, NGEN Technologies USA Corp., filed by Luke C. Zouvas.New Summons Requested. (Zouvas, Luke) (jjg). [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, for the County San Diego, case number 37-2017 00049135-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10760841.), filed by Greenfield Farms Food, Inc. The new case number is 3:17-cv-2575-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(tcf) (sjt). [Transferred from casd on 2/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A |