Ludwig v. State of Oregon
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Paul Papak |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00255 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 07, 2018 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Ludwig
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago |
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Acknowledgment of Transmittal of Case to State Court
Mon 04/30 4:38 PM
Acknowledgment from Multnomah County Circuit Court of Transmittal of Case to State Court13 . (rs) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Transmittal of Case to State Court
Mon 04/16 3:02 PM
Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to Multnomah County Circuit Court. (rs) |
|
12 | 12
order
Dismissal -Terminate Case
Mon 04/16 12:03 PM
ORDER OF REMAND: Based on the record, it is Ordered that this case is Remanded to Multnomah County Circuit Court for all further proceedings. Signed on 4/16/18 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) |
|
11 | 11
minute
Motion Hearing Held
Mon 04/16 12:01 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Oral Argument held 4/16/18. Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Multnomah County Circuit Court5 is Granted. Daniel Snyder present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jill Schneider present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. (gm) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
resp
Reply to Motion
Fri 04/06 4:37 PM
Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Chad Ludwig. (Snyder, Daniel) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
oth_sup
Declaration
Fri 03/23 2:49 PM
Declaration of Jill Schneider in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand . Filed by State of Oregon. (Schneider, Jill) |
|
8 | 8
resp
Response to Motion
Fri 03/23 2:47 PM
Response to Motion to Remand to State Court5 . Filed by State of Oregon. (Schneider, Jill) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
1 - Scheduling
Tue 03/13 2:53 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Multnomah County Circuit Court5 on the Oral Argument Calendar of 4/16/2018 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
oth_sup
Declaration
Mon 03/12 3:34 PM
Declaration of Daniel Snyder in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court . Filed by Chad Ludwig. (Snyder, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand
Mon 03/12 3:32 PM
Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Chad Ludwig. (Snyder, Daniel) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
limited
Consent to Magistrate - by Party
Fri 02/23 2:41 PM
|
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Administrative Correction of the Record
Wed 02/14 2:43 PM
Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and, if necessary, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to all parties: Plaintiff's counsel was not added at time of case opening on CM/ECF by defense counsel. Counsel for plaintiff has now been added for inclusion on all future notifications from this court. The Court will regenerate the NEF (Notice of Electronic Filing) of both the Notice of Removal1 and Notice of Case Assignment and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order2 . (gm) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Fri 02/09 10:46 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/11/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/9/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 7/9/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (rs) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 02/08 5:00 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 17CV44558 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5307123 issued.. Filed by State of Oregon. (Schneider, Jill) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |