New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:18-cv-01233
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 FLSA: Minimum Wage
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Mar 29, 2018 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Steven A. Cohen
Represented By
Michael Delikat
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (nyc)
contact info
Ana Shields
Jackson Lewis P.C. (suffolk)
contact info
Victoria Woodin Chavey
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Jill L. Rosenberg
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (nyc)
contact info
Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr.
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Douglas D. Haynes
Represented By
Michael Delikat
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (nyc)
contact info
Ana Shields
Jackson Lewis P.C. (suffolk)
contact info
Victoria Woodin Chavey
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Jill L. Rosenberg
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (nyc)
contact info
Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr.
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Point72 Asset Management, L.P.
Represented By
Michael Delikat
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (nyc)
contact info
Ana Shields
Jackson Lewis P.C. (suffolk)
contact info
Victoria Woodin Chavey
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Jill L. Rosenberg
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (nyc)
contact info
Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr.
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauren Bonner
Represented By
Michael John Willemin
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Kenneth Daniel Walsh
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, April 20, 2018
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 1:54 PM
ORDER: granting41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 30, 2018 is ADJOURNED pending resolution of Defendants' motion to compel arbitration, ECF No. 19. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/20/2018) (ap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
41 41 motion Extension of Time Thu 4:12 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit a joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Victoria Woodin Chavey dated April 19, 2018. Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P..(Chavey, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 1:51 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the appearance of Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr. from the docket. Attorney Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr terminated (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/9/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
39 39 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 1:04 PM
DECLARATION of Kevin P. Connolly in Support re:38 MOTION for Kevin P. Connolly to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Connolly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 1:02 PM
MOTION for Kevin P. Connolly to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P..(Connolly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Oral Argument Fri 9:37 AM
ORDER denying34 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. DENIED. The Court will resolve the motion on the papers. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/5/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12:21 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Victoria Woodin Chavey dated Ajpril 5, 2018 re:34 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument re Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeanne M. Christensen dated April 4, 2018. . Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Chavey, Victoria)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Fri 10:22 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 38 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 7:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Robert Thompson on behalf of Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Thompson, Mark)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Oral Argument Wed 1:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument re Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeanne M. Christensen dated April 4, 2018. Document filed by Lauren Bonner.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
33 33 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 12:48 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Chavey, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
32 32 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 8:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill L. Rosenberg on behalf of Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Rosenberg, Jill)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 8:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Delikat on behalf of Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Delikat, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
30 30 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ana Shields on behalf of Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Shields, Ana)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 3:21 PM
DECLARATION of Jeanne M. Christensen in Opposition re:19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Lauren Bonner.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Plaintiffs Agreement Regarding Conditions of Employment with Defendant Point 72 Asset Management, L.P.)
28 28 16 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 3:18 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Lauren Bonner. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
27 27 misc Sealed Document Tue 2:16 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
Related: [-]
26 26 32 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. Document filed by Lauren Bonner.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 11:37 AM
ORDER granting24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/27/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/21/2018 (cf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 6:52 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeanne M. Christensen dated February 26, 2018. Document filed by Lauren Bonner.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
23 23 order Memo Endorsement Fri 11:16 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Letter, filed by Point72 Asset Management, L.P., Douglas D. Haynes, Steven A. Cohen. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. By February 27, 201 8, Plaintiff shall file the redacted complaint on ECF and deliver an unredacted complaint to the Court's Records Management Department in accordance with Rule IV.A.iv of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the complaint filed on ECF on February 12, 2018, ECF No. 1. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/23/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk Fri 11:17 AM
Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re:23 Memo Endorsement to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (cf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
22 22 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 3:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Victoria W. Chavey dated February 22, 2018 re: Requesting to Seal Portions of Complaint. Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P..(Chavey, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Redacted Complaint)
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
21 21 2 pgs order Order Tue 2:28 PM
ORDER: On February 13, 2018, Defendants filed a letter motion to temporarily seal the complaint pending resolution of their motion to compel arbitration. ECF No. 9. For the reasons stated below, the motion is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/20/2018) (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
20 20 misc Letter Fri 2:54 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeanne M. Christensen dated February 16, 2018 re: Defendants' February 13, 2018 Letter Requesting to Temporarily Seal Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Lauren Bonner.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
19 19 2 pgs motion Compel Arbitration Wed 9:26 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P..(Chavey, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B
18 18 service Summons Issued Wed 1:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity). (vf)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Wed 1:26 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity). (vf)
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs order Order Wed 10:26 AM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by April 23, 2018, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 10:25 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 8:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Daniel Walsh on behalf of Lauren Bonner. (Walsh, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 8:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Willemin on behalf of Lauren Bonner. (Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 8:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Douglas D. Haynes, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lauren Bonner. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 8:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven A. Cohen, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lauren Bonner. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 6:28 PM
ORDER: On February 13, 2018, Defendants filed a letter requesting "on an expedited basis, that the Complaint filed by [Plaintiff] yesterday be sealed temporarily pending the resolution of the Motion to Seal the Complaint and Motion to Compel Arbitration." ECF No. 9. By February 16, 2018, Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants letter. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/13/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Tue 4:42 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Victoria Woodin Chavey dated February 13, 2018 re: Temporarily Sealing Plaintiff's Complaint Pending the Resolution of the Motion to Seal the Complaint and Motion to Compel Arbitration (Pre-Motion Letter). Document filed by Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P..(Chavey, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreement Regarding Conditions of Employment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Employment Arbitration Rules
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr on behalf of Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Connolly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victoria Woodin Chavey on behalf of Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Chavey, Victoria)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 4:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 2:38 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 2:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 2:39 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 4:28 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party names does not exactly match the name that was entered on CM/ECF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
5 5 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 6:11 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Douglas D. Haynes, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lauren Bonner. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jgo).
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 6:10 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven A. Cohen, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lauren Bonner. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jgo).
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 6:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Point72 Asset Management, L.P., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lauren Bonner. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 6:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 6:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Steven A. Cohen(in his professional capacity), Steven A. Cohen(in his individual capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his professional capacity), Douglas D. Haynes(in his individual capacity), Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14691786)Document filed by Lauren Bonner.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]