TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED et al v. ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01994 |
Nature of Suit | 835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 10:18 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
CADILA HEALTHCARE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CADILA HEALTHCARE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV ERIC J. LOBENFELD
|
|
Notice Only
PHV CHRISTOPHER WILSON
|
|
Notice Only
PHV JOSEPH OSTOYICH
|
|
Notice Only
PHV STEVEN J. MOORE
|
|
Notice Only
PHV WILLIAM C. LAVERY
|
|
Notice Only
PHV DANIEL LANDESBERG
|
|
Notice Only
PHV BENJAMIN F. HOLT
|
|
Notice Only
NEL-SYLVIA M. GUZMAN
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ERIN J. FRAKE
|
|
Notice Only
PHV NITYA ANAND
|
|
Plaintiff
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Movant
FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Terminated: 01/28/2019
600 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20580 |
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV STEPHEN WEISSMAN
Terminated: 03/26/2021
|
|
Notice Only
PHV MICHAEL PERRY
Terminated: 03/26/2021
|
|
Notice Only
PHV TAKASHI OKUDA
Terminated: 07/14/2020
|
|
Notice Only
PHV CAILYN REILLY KNAPP
Terminated: 01/08/2021
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ASHLEY EICKHOF
Terminated: 02/13/2020
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ARLENE L. CHOW
Terminated: 06/26/2020
|
|
Notice Only
PHV NICHOLAS BROD
Terminated: 07/08/2019
|
GPO
Dec 19 2018
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/19/2018. (km) |
|
GPO
Jul 26 2021
OPINION filed. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 07/26/2021. (jdb) |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Wed 01/04 8:51 AM
Pursuant to the USCA Mandate176 , the USDC Order169 entered 7/26/2021 is AFFIRMED. (mg) |
||
appeal
Mandate Notice
Wed 01/04 8:51 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 1/3/2023. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (mg) |
||
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
176 | 176
appeal
USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal)
Tue 01/03 1:20 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to173 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., CADILA HEALTHCARE LIMITED (Finance notified)(ca3tmm, ) |
|
Att: 1 mandate letter, | ||
Att: 2 opinion |