Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund et al v. World Class Fire Protection LLC
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Jarrod Hazel |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-00448 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 12, 2018 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
World Class Fire Protection LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Fri 07/13 4:39 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving5 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/13/2018. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 05/10 4:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund(Gilligan, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 03/13 11:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund. World Class Fire Protection LLC waiver sent on 3/12/2018, answer due 5/11/2018.(Gilligan, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/14 8:49 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to World Class Fire Protection LLC.(aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/13 3:47 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund (Gilligan, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/13 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT against World Class Fire Protection LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7153876.), filed by Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund.(Gilligan, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for World Class Fire Protection LLC |