Sultan v. Coinbase, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00934 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 12, 2018 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Coinbase, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ezra C. Sultan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Thu 12/05 10:58 AM
Letter to Judge Block re status by Ezra C. Sultan (Dweck, Jack) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/04 9:11 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry25 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/4/2019. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/03 6:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 11/26 12:47 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: By December 6, 2019 counsel shall file a letter as to the status of their arbitration. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/26/2019. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Thu 09/19 5:38 PM
Letter to Hon. Frederic Block - Arbitration Status Update by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Thu 08/29 11:23 AM
Letter to Judge Block regarding Status Report Order by Ezra C. Sultan (Dweck, Jack) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Mon 08/26 3:01 PM
Letter to Hon. Frederic Block - Arbitration Status Update by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 08/22 11:47 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: By September 6, 2019 counsel shall file a letter as to the status of their arbitration. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/22/2019. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Wed 07/10 1:03 PM
Letter to Hon. Frederic Block - Arbitration Status Update by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Tue 06/04 2:25 PM
Letter to Hon. Frederic Block - Arbitration Status Update by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 05/30 11:23 AM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: By June 6, 2019 counsel shall file a letter as to the status of their arbitration. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/30/2019. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Thu 01/24 4:37 PM
MEMORANDUM and ORDER: There is no dispute that Sultan had inquiry notice of the User Agreement, including its mandatory arbitration provision, and that he manifested his assent to that agreement. There being no dispute that this lawsuit is within the scope of the arbitration provision, Coinbases motion16 to compel arbitration is granted. Since Coinbase has requested that the lawsuit be stayed pending arbitration, such a stay is granted. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/24/2019. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Wed 01/16 4:28 PM
Letter to Hon. Frederic Block Providing Notice of Supplemental Authority by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Starke v. SquareTrade, Inc., No. 17-2474 (2d Cir. January 10, 2019) | ||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Thu 07/05 3:53 PM
Letter to Hon. Frederic Block Enclosing Courtesy Copies by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Compel
Thu 07/05 3:50 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Coinbase, Inc.. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration - Justin Lyn in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - User Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2- Account Creation Webpage, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Account Creation Webpage with Prompt, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Event Report, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 9 Memorandum in Opposition, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration Ezra Sultan in Opposition, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 1 - Email Message, | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 13 Memorandum in Support - Reply, | ||
Att: 14 Declaration - Justin Lyn in Reply | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/13 4:08 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Ezra C. Sultan. (Lum, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/13 4:20 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting the parties stipulation15 extending the time until July 5, 2018 for the parties to serve and file their fully briefed motion to compel arbitration. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/13/2018. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 05/09 3:21 PM
Letter to Judge Block with proposed briefing schedule by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 05/09 3:18 PM
Letter to MJ Tiscione re: Confidentiality Order by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/09 3:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: By June 27, 2018 counsel shall file their fully briefed motion to compel arbitration according to J. Blocks motion rules. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/9/2018. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 05/09 3:56 PM
ORDER re13 Letter filed by Coinbase, Inc.: The confidentiality Order is approved and hereby entered as an Order of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/9/2018. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 05/02 12:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jack Dweck, Esq. for the plaintiff and Paul Han Kim, Esq. for the defendants, all present. Pre-motion conference held on 5/2/2018. Defendants anticipated motion to compel arbitration was discussed. By May 9, 2018 counsel shall ECF file a letter with their agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall serve and ECF file their fully briefed motion according to J. Blocks motion rules.(Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 04/10 9:39 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application12 dated 4/9/18, with the consent of plaintiff's counsel is GRANTED. The pre-motion conference scheduled for April 19, 2018 is adjourned to May 2, 2018 at 11:00 A.M. The Court is not available on the other dates requested by counsel. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/10/2018. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 04/09 6:44 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Coinbase, Inc.. (Kim, Paul) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/09 6:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/09 6:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Myung Han Kim on behalf of Coinbase, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Kim, Paul) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/09 11:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The defendant's letter application7 dated 3/23/18 is GRANTED. A pre motion conference is scheduled on April 19, 2018 @ 11AM. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference and then file a letter application. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/9/2018. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Fri 03/30 6:58 PM
Letter to Court regarding Def.'s Request for Pre-Motion Conf. by Ezra C. Sultan (Dweck, Jack) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Fri 03/23 4:31 PM
Letter Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Coinbase, Inc. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 03/05 1:31 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to March 23, 2018 to Answer for Defendant. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/5/2018. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/02 5:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Coinbase, Inc.. (Kim, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/14 5:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ezra C. Sultan. Coinbase, Inc. served on 2/14/2018, answer due 3/7/2018. (Dweck, Jack) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/14 10:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Coinbase, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 02/14 10:23 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 02/14 10:23 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/14 10:23 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/13 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT against Coinbase, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10196579 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Ezra C. Sultan. (Dweck, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Summons, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |