27
|
|
27
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 11/29 9:49 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/28/2018. (dmr)
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/28 3:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by KEVIN BRANAGAN, MICHAEL J. HAGNER, VOORHEES TOWNSHIP, VOORHEES TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT. (RISO, ERIC)
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Thu 10/25 3:11 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 12/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/25/2018. (dmr)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 10/22 12:01 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS OFFICER KEVIN BRANAGAN and OFFICER MICHAEL J. HAGNER ONLY. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/22/2018. (dmr)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 10/19 10:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial) by KEVIN BRANAGAN, MICHAEL J. HAGNER. (RISO, ERIC)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 09/28 9:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Settlement Conference held on 9/27/2018. (nar)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/10 3:37 PM
ORDER re: Settlement Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 2:00 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/8/2018. (dmr)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
misc
Letter
Fri 08/03 4:30 PM
Letter from Richard M. Wiener. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
misc
Letter
Fri 08/03 4:22 PM
Letter from Honorable Karen M. Williams. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
order
Discovery Confidentiality Order
Tue 07/03 3:22 PM
Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/2/2018. (dmr)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
misc
Letter
Mon 07/02 2:26 PM
Letter from Richard M. Wiener, Esquire. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
misc
Letter
Tue 06/26 4:26 PM
Letter from Eric J. Riso, Esquire with Discovery Confidentiality Order. (RISO, ERIC)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/14 11:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2018. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 11/30/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/13/2018. (dmr)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 06/13 4:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 6/13/2018. (nar)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
order
Order
Mon 06/11 4:40 PM
TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/11/18. (nar)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 05/07 11:11 AM
TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated May 4, 2018 from Richard M. Wiener, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for May 31, 2018, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is June 13, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/7/18. (nar)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
misc
Letter
Fri 05/04 3:51 PM
Letter from Richard M. Wiener, Esq.. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
6
pgs
order
Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)
Thu 05/03 9:18 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 3:30 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/3/2018. (dmr)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/02 11:10 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by KEVIN BRANAGAN, MICHAEL J. HAGNER, VOORHEES TOWNSHIP, VOORHEES TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT.(RISO, ERIC)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/16 10:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SEAN M. SHAW. VOORHEES TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 3/16/2018, answer due 5/15/2018. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/16 10:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SEAN M. SHAW. MICHAEL J. HAGNER waiver sent on 3/16/2018, answer due 5/15/2018. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/16 10:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SEAN M. SHAW. KEVIN BRANAGAN waiver sent on 3/16/2018, answer due 5/15/2018. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/15 1:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SEAN M. SHAW. VOORHEES TOWNSHIP waiver sent on 3/8/2018, answer due 5/7/2018. (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/27 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SEAN M. SHAW Service of Voorhees Township Police Department (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/27 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SEAN M. SHAW Service on Voorhees Township (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/27 12:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SEAN M. SHAW on Police Officer Michael J. Hagner (#34100) (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/27 10:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SEAN M. SHAW Service on Police Offier Kevin Branagan (WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/14 4:45 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KEVIN BRANAGAN, MICHAEL J. HAGNER, VOORHEES TOWNSHIP, VOORHEES TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ryan Sanders* (rss, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/14 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8478800) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SEAN M. SHAW.(WIENER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|
|
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 02/14 3:15 PM
Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 02/14 4:46 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information,In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do not select all plaintiffs or all defendants. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (rss, )
Related: [-]
|