Fountain v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01546 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 13, 2018 3:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Fountain
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
10
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/18 3:05 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/12/2021. (per minute entry entered in master case no. 16-MD-2740 at Rec. Doc. 13327)(am) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 05/23 8:14 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Wed 03/07 9:41 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/28 12:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (aj) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 02/28 12:10 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (aj) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 02/14 3:05 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/14 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6658221) filed by Lisa Fountain.Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Lisa Fountain(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons |