WB Music Corp. et al v. FutureToday, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01238 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0106 Motion Pictures & Other Audiovisual Works |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 13, 2018 1:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
FutureToday, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Unichappell Music Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
W.B.M. Music Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WB Music Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Mon 09/10 3:32 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed closing report to Copyright Office. (lc) |
|
45 | 45
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 09/10 3:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE44 . The Court is in receipt of the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice44 filed September 10, 2018. No Proposed Order was attached. The Court grants the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed, in its entirety, with prejudice. Neither party is the prevailing party and each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. All dates are herebyvacated.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
44 | 44
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 09/10 10:38 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 08/28 3:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR QUASH PROCESS AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT24 .the Court DENIES defendants motion to dismiss the Complaint or quash process, and DENIES defendants motion for a more definite statement. (lc) |
|
42 | 42
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/28 10:21 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to defendant Future Today, Inc. (lc) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Summons Request
Mon 08/27 4:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Order,,40 filed by plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/24 12:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING AMENDMENT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT 39] by Judge Christina A. Snyder: 1)Within one (1) court day of the approval of this stipulation, Plaintiffs shall file a request for the issuance of an Amended Summons in the form annexed as Exhibit A to the Stipulation; (2)Defendant shall accept service of the Amended Summons by electronic service to Defendants counsel of record; (3)The name of Defendant in the caption of Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. 1) shall be deemed amended to read Future Today, Inc. instead of FutureToday, Inc.; and (4)The date by which Defendant shall answer the Complaint shall be September 14, 2018. (lc) |
|
39 | 39
stip
Amend/Correct
Thu 08/23 12:54 PM
STIPULATION to AMEND Summons Request2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant FutureToday, Inc..(Borodkin, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Mon 08/20 3:38 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. Within twenty-one (21) days, plaintiff shall obtain the consent of a neutral listed on the Court's Mediation Panel who will conduct the mediation, and file form ADR-2, Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program will assign one. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/29/19. The Court further sets a status conference for 4/8/2019 11:00 AM. (lom) |
|
37 | 37
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form Motion Hearing Quash Quash Summons Dismiss Case More Definite Statement
Mon 08/20 3:33 PM
MINUTES OF (1) DEFENDANT FUTURETODAY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR QUASH PROCESS UNDER FRCP (12)(b)(4) AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER FRCP 12(e)24 ; and (2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. For reasons stated on the record, the Court denies the motion to dismiss but will allow the issuance of an amended summons. The Court orders the parties to submit a stipulation and proposed order regarding the amended summons and the amended caption portion of the complaint. The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties: 12/31/2018; Settlement Completion Cutoff: 3/29/2019; Factual Discovery Cut-off: 5/17/2019; Last Day to File Motions: 5/31/2019; Exchange of Expert Reports Cut-off: 4/12/2019; Exchange of Rebuttal Reports Cut-off: 5/3/2019; Expert Discovery Cut-off: 5/17/2019; Status Conference re: Settlement (11:00 A.M.): 4/8/2019; Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine (11:00 A.M.): 7/29/2019; and Jury Trial (9:30 A.M.): 8/13/2019. See document for details. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 08/13 8:08 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiffs: 5-7 days; Defendant: 2 days, filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp... (Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 08/07 12:41 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Initially filed in Error under Incorrect ECF Event) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement24 California Secretary of State Website filed by Defendant FutureToday, Inc.. (Borodkin, Lisa) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 08/06 11:58 PM
REPLY in support Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Initially filed in Error under Incorrect ECF Event) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement24 filed by Defendant FutureToday, Inc.. (Borodkin, Lisa) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 08/03 4:19 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCED by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: 8/20/2018 Scheduling Conference is advanced from 11:00 AM to 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder, to be heard simultaneously with the Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons, to Dismiss Case, and for More Definite Statement24 . NOTE: TIME CHANGE ONLY.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
24
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/30 6:17 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Initially filed in Error under Incorrect ECF Event) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement24 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Bradley J. Mullins | ||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Thu 07/12 4:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON FUTURE TODAY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR QUASH PROCESS AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT30 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The hearing date on Future Today, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Process and for a More Definite Statement is continued from August 6, 2018 to August 20, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Continue
Wed 07/11 1:38 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Future Today, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Process and for a More Definite Statement from August 6, 2018 to August 20, 2018 Re: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Initially filed in Error under Incorrect ECF Event) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement24 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Future Today, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Process and for a More Definite Statement | ||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 07/05 3:02 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference is set for 8/20/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Thu 06/21 1:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION27 TO CONTINUE HEARING ON FUTURE TODAY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR QUASH PROCESS AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT24 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The hearing date on Future Today, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Process and for a More Definite Statement is continued from July 16, 2018 to August 6, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Continue
Wed 06/20 6:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue the Hearing Date on Future Today, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Process and for a More Definite Statement from July 16, 2018 to August 6, 2018 Re: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Initially filed in Error under Incorrect ECF Event) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement24 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Future Today, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Process and for a More Definite Statement | ||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 06/18 12:57 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:FutureToday, Inc Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): pdf document is NOT an Answer but Moton to dismiss and quash, if so correct event is: Motion: Dismiss case and Quash summons. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Saturday, June 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sat 06/16 12:30 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by (erroneously named Defendant) FutureToday, Inc., identifying NAS Insurance Services, LLC. (Borodkin, Lisa) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Quash Quash Summons Dismiss Case More Definite Statement
Sat 06/16 12:09 AM
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Initially filed in Error under Incorrect ECF Event) , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant (Erroneously named) FutureToday, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Borodkin, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/15 11:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or QUash under Rule 12(b)(4) and Rule 12(e) filed by Defendant (Erroneously named) FutureToday, Inc..(Attorney Lisa J Borodkin added to party FutureToday, Inc.(pty:dft))(Borodkin, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 06/07 4:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT FUTURE TODAY, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO JUNE 15, 201821 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 06/06 6:12 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 15, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation and Joint Request to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by More Than 30 Days | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 05/29 4:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS TO JUNE 8, 201819 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) |
|
Monday, May 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 05/28 5:44 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 8, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 05/11 12:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINTBY MORE THAN 30 DAYS17 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant FutureToday, Inc. answer due 6/1/2018 (lc) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 05/09 11:58 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 1, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3) | ||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 04/25 2:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS TO MAY 11, 201815 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Tue 04/24 2:45 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 11, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation and Joint Request to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by More Than 30 Days | ||
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 04/17 1:36 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 04/11 2:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS12 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant Future Today, Inc. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until April 27, 2018. (lc) Modified on 4/11/2018 (lc) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Tue 04/10 3:18 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 27, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by More Than 30 Days | ||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 03/12 10:07 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to FutureToday, Inc. answer now due 4/13/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs WB Music Corp.; Unichappell Music Inc.; W.B.M. Music Corp.; Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 02/27 5:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WB Music Corp., Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., upon Defendant FutureToday, Inc. served on 2/21/2018, answer due 3/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emily Del-Cid, Assistant, Corporate Agents, Inc., Registered Agent for Service of Process of Defendant FutureToday, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Mon 02/26 4:38 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-01238 CAS (FFMx). (esa) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 02/15 2:04 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant FutureToday, Inc. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 02/15 1:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 02/15 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 02/14 7:34 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Mullins, Bradley) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 02/14 7:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., identifying Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., WMG Acquisition Corp., WMG Holdings Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., AI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Access Industries, Inc.. (Mullins, Bradley) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 02/14 7:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Mullins, Bradley) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 02/14 7:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Mullins, Bradley) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 02/14 7:09 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21264546 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs WB Music Corp., Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party Unichappell Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party W.B.M. Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party WB Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.(pty:pla))(Mullins, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule A to Complaint |