Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:18-cv-00283
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2018
Last checked: Monday Aug 13, 2018 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Robert T. Cruzen
Klarquist Sparkman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc.
a Georgia Corporation 358 Osprey Crescent
St. Mary's, GA 31558
Defendant
Empire Design and Insignia
a New York Limited Liability Company 7105 Third Avenue Suite 511
Brooklyn, NY 11209
Defendant
Kidder Corp
a Delaware Corporation 270 East Hill Road
Canton, CT 06019
Defendant
Milcoins.com LLC
a Connecticut Limited Liability Company 18 Live Oaks Road
Milford, CT 06460
Defendant
Ismael Ramos
an individual NEPMU-6 385 South Ave Building 618
Pearl Harbor, HI 96860
Defendant
Spreadshirt Inc.
a Delaware Corporation 186 South Street 3rd Floor
Boston, MA 02111
Represented By
Casey M. Nokes
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sunfrog LLC
a Michigan Limited Liability Company 1782 O"Rourke Blvd
Gaylord, MI 49735
Represented By
David H. Madden
Mersenne Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Teespring.com Inc
a Delaware Corporation 9 E Loockerman Street Suite 311
Dover, DE 19901
Represented By
Ryan T. O'Hollaren
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Todd G. Glass
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Anthony J. Weibell
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
US DOD Coins LLC
a Florida Limited Liability Company 3623 Craigsher Drive
Apopka, FL 32712
Defendant
Veteran Apparel LLC
a North Carolina Limited Liability Company 224 Topsail Drive
Ainger, NV 27501
Defendant
Viralstyle LLC
a Florida Limited Liability Company 601 N. Ashley Drive Suite 500
Tampa, FL 33602
Plaintiff
Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC
Represented By
James Edwin Bailey, III
Bailey & Yarmo LLP
contact info
Mark S. Hubert
Mark S. Hubert, P.C.
contact info
Aron D. Yarmo
Bailey & Yarmo, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Teezilly LLC
Terminated: 06/25/2018
a New York Limited Liability Company 80 State Street
Albany, NY 12207


Docket last updated: 10/11/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 12, 2019
transfer Case Electronically Transferred Out to Another District Mon 11:36 AM
Case (specifically, plaintiff's claims against Teespring) electronically transferred out to the Northern District of California per Order (#111 ). Other Court Case Number 4:19-cv-04607 assigned. (eo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
112 112 notice Attorney Substitution Tue 12:41 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James Mills is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Daniel DiCicco Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Mills, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
111 111 2 pgs order Order on Findings & Recommendation Mon 2:28 PM
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Beckerman's Findings and Recommendation109 . Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendant Teespring's motions to sever and transfer and DENIES its motion to dismiss94 . Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Teespring are severed from this action and transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 8/5/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gw)
Related: [-]