G.S. et al v. PENN-TRAFFORD SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | William S Stickman |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00204 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Aug 03, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 14, 2018 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
ANTHONY AQUILIO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GREGORY CAPOCCIONI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW HARRIS
43 Cameo Place
Levitton, PA 19057 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCOTT INGLESE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PENN-TRAFFORD SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S.S.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 19 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 38 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/19/20. (eca) |
1. | Lawsuit filed against Penn-Trafford School District alleging bullying and assault (triblive.com) |
Submitted Tue 02/20/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
62 | 62
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Tue 04/09 12:10 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Gary Caruso is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 07/09/24. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/09/24. (eca) |
|
61 | 61
order
Case Management Order
Tue 04/09 12:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 05/07/24; Joinder of Parties due 05/07/24; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 04/23/24; Discovery ends 08/07/24; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 08/07/24 at 10:00 AM; Call parameters outlined herein; Summary Judgment due by 08/21/24; Response to Summary Judgment due by 09/20/24; Reply brief due by 10/04/24; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/09/24. (eca) |
|
60 | 60
minutes
Initial Case Management Conference
Tue 04/09 11:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2024. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
59 | 59
adr
Stipulation Selecting ADR process
Wed 04/03 2:15 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by G.S., S.S. (Lindsay, Alexander) |
|
58 | 58
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 04/03 2:14 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lindsay, Alexander) |
|
misc
QC - Attorney Signature Deficient
Wed 04/03 4:03 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re58 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information (Pennsylvania or other state bar identification number). CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss) |