U.S. Bank National Association v. Vasendin et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Seibel |
Case #: | 7:18-cv-01418 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332fc Diversity - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 15, 2018 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jennifer V. Vasendin
|
|
Defendant
Maxim Vasendin
|
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/25 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Referee's Report of Sale. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/25 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Surplus Monies Form. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/28 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Surplus Monies Form. Document filed by Christopher B Meagher. (Meagher, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Decree of Foreclosure and Judgment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 09/05 3:27 PM
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE: ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that Judgment of For closure and Sale is entered against Maxim Vasendin and Jennifer V. Vasendin in the amount $338,587.66 with an unpaid principal balance of $292,660.66 as of June 2, 2018, with contractual interest at the rate of 5.375% percent which results in daily per diem rate of $43.10 until entry of this order and the statutory rate thereafter; and it is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that upon said testimony and exhibits, that the amount due Plaintiff on the Note is $338,583.66, together with interest as specified herein, and that the mortgaged property at 56 DID DELL ROAD, WAPPINGERS FALLS, NY 12590, ("Property") cannot be sold in parcels; and it is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that the application is hereby granted without opposition, as further set forth in this Order. Amount Due Plaintiff. $338,587.66 including interest through June 2, 2018, together with interest at the Note rate (5.375%) until the date of entry of this Judgment, and thereafter at the statutory rate until the date of transfer of the Referee's Deed. Costs and Disbursements. $961.56 adjudged to the Plaintiff for costs and disbursements in the action, which will be taxed by the County Clerk and inserted herein, with interest at the Judgment rate thereon from the date of entry hereof. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that pursuant to CPLR 8003(b), absent application to the court, further court order, and compliance with Part 36 of the Rules of the Chief Judge, the Referee shall not demand, accept or receive more than the statutory amount of five hundred dollars ($500.00) otherwise payable to the Referee for the foreclosure sale stage, regardless of adjournment, delay or stay of the sale, as further set forth in this Order. Motions terminated:14 MOTION for Judgment of Foreclosure and sale filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/5/2018) (mml) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Wed 09/05 8:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/4/2018. Defendants were not present. The Judgment against the Defendants will not be signed by the Court until Plaintiff files letter with Court regarding Plaintiff counsel's main office as set forth in the Articles of Incorporation. See transcript. (Court Reporter Sabrina D'Emidio) (wc) |
||
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/31 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marie Theresa Nicholson on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Nicholson, Marie) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Fri 08/31 9:16 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. 17 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 08/30 4:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause for Default Judgment and Supporting documents served on Maxim Vasendin and Jennifer Vasendin on 08/10/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Judgment
Thu 08/30 4:21 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
16 | 16
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 08/30 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:14 MOTION for Judgment of Foreclosure and sale . . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 08/30 4:07 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Nardolillo, Esq in Support re:14 MOTION for Judgment of Foreclosure and sale .. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-I, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-I | ||
14 | 14
motion
Judgment
Thu 08/30 3:57 PM
MOTION for Judgment of Foreclosure and sale . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 08/10 2:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents served on Maxim Vasendin and Jennifer Vasendin on August 10, 2018. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Nardolillo, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/06 9:25 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT filed by U.S. Bank National Association. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that upon the attached Affirmations of Gross Polowy, LLC by Michael W. Nardolillo, Esq. Attorneys for Plaintiff dated June 26, 2018 and the exhibits attached thereto, the Memorandum of Law of Michael W. Nardolillo, Esq., d upon all the proceedings in this case to date, the Plaintiff will move this Court on September 4 at 9:45 am before U.S. District Judge Cathy Seibel at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York located at 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601, Courtroom 621, for an order granting default judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55, judgment of foreclosure and sale pursuant to New York Real Property Actions and Proceedings Law 1351 and 1354, and related relief. Opposition papers, if any, are to be served and filed by August 28. Upon this order being granted, movant is directed to serve the Order to Show Cause and supporting papers on the Defendants by means of express mail by August 10. Movant is further directed to promptly file, on ECF, all papers submitted in support of the Motion and Order. So Ordered. (Show Cause Hearing set for 9/4/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2018.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/3/2018) (anc) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/13 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael William Nardolillo on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Nardolillo, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Thu 05/03 3:20 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Default Issued (kty) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Request to Enter Default
Thu 05/03 7:18 AM
REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Maxim Vasendin and Jennifer Vasendin . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Non Military Affidavit Under The Servicemembers' Civil Relief Act | ||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Other Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/18 3:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served on Maxim Vasendin on 04/06/2018. Service was accepted by Maxim Vasendin. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association., SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Maxim Vasendin served on 4/6/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. Service was accepted by Maxim Vasendin. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/26 2:13 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jennifer V. Vasendin served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018. Service was accepted by Bridgett Sweeney. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lis Pendens
Fri 02/23 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/20 11:46 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer V. Vasendin, Maxim Vasendin. (pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 02/20 11:41 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 02/20 11:42 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 02/20 11:42 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/16 1:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bank N.A., Other Affiliate U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Vargas, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 02/16 1:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 02/16 1:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maxim Vasendin, Jennifer V. Vasendin, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/16 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Jennifer V. Vasendin, Maxim Vasendin. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14710864)Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Vargas, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B |