Davis v. JBS Plainwell, Inc.
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Janet T Neff |
Referred: | Ellen S Carmody |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00163 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12111 American Disability Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 15, 2018 5:35 AM EDT |
defendant
JBS Plainwell, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jermaine Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation to Dismiss
Thu 08/01 9:36 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting STIPULATION to dismiss42 ; dismissing this action with prejudice, and with each party to bear its own costs; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/31 11:20 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Dismissal Papers
Wed 07/31 10:43 AM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 8/7/2019; placing parties on notice concerning dismissal; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Dismissal Papers
Wed 06/26 4:02 PM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 7/24/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
39 | 39
adr
Facilitative Mediation Report
Wed 06/26 1:55 PM
REPORT of facilitative mediation held June 24, 2019; mediation is complete; case is settled, (Denenfeld, Stephen) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/17 9:29 AM
ORDER granting37 joint motion to extend case management order deadline; extending deadlines for completion of discovery, ADR and pre-motion conference requests; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/16 11:56 AM
JOINT MOTION for extension of time to Case Management Order Deadlines by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc.; (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/01 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Jermaine Davis - Amended by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/14 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jermaine Davis for Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant (Piper, William) |
|
34 | 34
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/14 11:59 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jermaine Davis for Notice of Taking Deposition (Piper, William) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/08 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Jermaine Davis by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
service
Proof of Service
Wed 03/06 5:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. for Subpoena Duces Tecum (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 02/14 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. for Response to Second Request for Production of Documents (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/05 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 01/22 10:52 AM
ORDER granting28 joint motion to extend certain case management order deadlines; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 01/17 4:47 PM
JOINT MOTION for extension of time to certain deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc.; (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/14 2:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jermaine Davis for Plaintiff 's Answers and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (Piper, William) |
|
26 | 26
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/14 11:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jermaine Davis for Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant (Piper, William) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
service
Proof of Service
Thu 12/20 4:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. for Amended Answers to Interrogatories and Amended Responses to Request for Production (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Protective Order
Tue 12/18 4:11 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents)
Tue 12/18 1:57 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER of Protective Order by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Acknowledgement of Protective Order | ||
order
Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document)
Tue 12/18 2:48 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING STIPULATED PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER23 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
||
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 12/13 3:55 PM
ORDER denying STIPULATION21 without prejudice; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents)
Thu 12/13 2:49 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Acknowledgement of Protective Order | ||
order
Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document)
Thu 12/13 3:36 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING STIPULATED PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER21 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
service
Proof of Service
Thu 11/29 2:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. for Request for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Proof of Service
Fri 09/21 5:04 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. for Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/08 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jermaine Davis for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant (Piper, William) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/11 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jermaine Davis for Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Piper, William) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
service
Proof of Service
Fri 07/06 3:31 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. for Rule 26(a) disclosures (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received
Thu 07/05 12:05 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 10893 as to plaintiff Jermaine Davis (lep) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received
Tue 07/03 1:51 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 22645 as to defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (lep) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received
Tue 07/03 1:49 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 1003718 as to defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (lep) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator
Mon 06/25 1:22 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Stephen M. Denenfeld ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 7/2/2018 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 7/2/2018 (lep) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator
Tue 06/19 9:37 AM
SELECTION of Stephen Denenfeld as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Jermaine Davis (Piper, William) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Case Management Order
Wed 06/06 11:26 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: settlement conference set for 1/3/2020 at 2:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; final pretrial conference set for 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; jury trial set for 3/17/2020 at 09:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; counsel shall be present for an in-chambers conference one-half hour prior to the start of trial; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) Modified text on 6/6/2018 (pjw) |
|
12 | 12
minutes
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16
Wed 06/06 10:46 AM
MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: not recorded) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 06/04 9:16 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Michael Edsenga on behalf of defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) |
||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Status Report (Rule 16)
Wed 05/30 2:24 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Piper, William) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Rescheduling Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Thu 04/26 11:51 AM
ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference rescheduled to 6/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 5/30/2018; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Wed 03/28 9:38 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 5/10/2018; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/27 2:19 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Rebecca L. Strauss on behalf of defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Strauss, Rebecca) |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/26 1:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/26 1:06 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by JBS Plainwell, Inc. (Moland, Abigail) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/09 11:46 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; JBS Plainwell, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018 (Piper, William) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/16 1:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant JBS Plainwell, Inc. (cep) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Fri 02/16 1:21 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (cep) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Fri 02/16 11:14 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Piper, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 02/16 11:13 AM
DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Jermaine Davis (Piper, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/16 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against JBS Plainwell, Inc. filed by Jermaine Davis (Piper, William) |
|
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Fri 02/16 11:17 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Jermaine Davis in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4056491 (Piper, William) |