15
|
|
15
11
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 02/03 10:45 AM
ORDER that Pfizer shall be DISMISSED without prejudice (filed in Master - MDL ORDER REGARDING CMO 60 re Pfizer Defendants [DE#709]). PFIZER INC. terminated. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/22/2022. (jl, )
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
26
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/22 7:23 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs enumerated on the attached Exhibit A are hereby ordered to show cause within thirty (30) days as follows (1) establish that service was effected on Pfizer as required by Rule 4(m) by filing proof of service, (2) voluntarily dismiss Pfizer, or (3) show cause why Pfizer should not be dismissed. (Special Master Order). Signed by Ellen Reisman, Special Master on 11/19/2021. (jl, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/08 3:58 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (wh)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/21 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN J. MCCONNELL on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC (MCCONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 01/19 4:19 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER ADDING DEFENDANTS GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC and GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTH, INC. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/31/20. (jc, )
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/11 1:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/11/18. (jl, )
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 06/01 2:16 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/23/18. (lag, )
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/22 4:17 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Dismissal of Specified AstraZeneca Defendants (SILEO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/10 1:36 PM
Short-Form ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Certificate of Service by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP.(HINDY, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/12 4:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHEL HOLLOWAY, BRENDA HOLLOWAY. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. (SILEO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/12 4:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHEL HOLLOWAY, BRENDA HOLLOWAY. ASTRAZENECA LP served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. (SILEO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/12 4:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHEL HOLLOWAY, BRENDA HOLLOWAY. WYETH-ATERST LABORATORIES served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (SILEO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/12 4:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHEL HOLLOWAY, BRENDA HOLLOWAY. WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (SILEO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/12 4:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHEL HOLLOWAY, BRENDA HOLLOWAY. WYETH LLC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (SILEO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/16 1:53 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRA US HOLDING CORPORATION, ASTRA USA LLC, ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA PLC, PFIZER INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC, WYETH-ATERST LABORATORIES, ZENECA INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *DARLENE CARR* (dc, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/16 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8485597) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHEL HOLLOWAY, BRENDA HOLLOWAY.(SILEO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|
|
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 02/16 1:37 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (tt, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Case Management Order
Fri 02/16 1:55 PM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] (dc, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
mdl
MDL Direct File
Fri 02/16 1:56 PM
Member Case Direct File on 2/16/18, for MDL 2789 PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II). (dc, )
Related: [-]
|