BULLARD et al v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Mark Falk |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02262 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 15, 2018 5:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
Represented By
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)
|
|
Plaintiff
DEBRA BULLARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK BULLARD
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
ASTRA US HOLDING CORPORATION
Terminated: 06/01/2018
|
|
Defendant
ASTRA USA LLC
Terminated: 06/01/2018
|
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA AB
Terminated: 06/01/2018
|
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PLC
Terminated: 06/01/2018
|
|
Defendant
ZENECA INC.
Terminated: 06/01/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |