SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19 et al v. CAMDEN MECHANICAL LLC
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Juan R Sanchez |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00690 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 14, 2018 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
CAMDEN MECHANICAL LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
GARY MASINO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' ANNUITY FUND: OF LOCAL NO. 19
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' INTERNATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTE (ITI)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' JOINT APPRENTICESHIP FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL 19
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' PENSION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' SUPPLEMENTAL UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFIT (S.U.B.) FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHEET METAL WORKERS' VACATION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
misc
Case Transferred Out
Tue 03/05 8:02 AM
Original record Transferred forwarded to District of District of New Jersey via CM/ECF for Defendant Cherry Hill Township only. (nd, ) (FILED IN ERROR; REFILED ON 19CV690) Modified on 3/5/2019 (nd, ) |
||
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/19 2:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GARY MASINO, SHEET METAL WORKERS' ANNUITY FUND: OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' INTERNATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTE (ITI), SHEET METAL WORKERS' JOINT APPRENTICESHIP FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' PENSION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' SUPPLEMENTAL UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFIT (S.U.B.) FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' VACATION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19 (MILZ, MARTIN) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/19 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GARY MASINO, SHEET METAL WORKERS' ANNUITY FUND: OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' INTERNATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTE (ITI), SHEET METAL WORKERS' JOINT APPRENTICESHIP FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' PENSION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' SUPPLEMENTAL UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFIT (S.U.B.) FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' VACATION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19 (MILZ, MARTIN) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/17 11:13 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Damiano re: served Court Order upon Tom by Affidavit of Service on April 11, 2018 (MARTIN, SYRETTA) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/10 11:42 AM
ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT5 SHALL BE HELD ON 5/7/18 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/10/18. 4/10/18 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 03/27 3:29 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Camden Mechanical LLC filed by GARY MASINO, SHEET METAL WORKERS' ANNUITY FUND: OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' INTERNATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTE (ITI), SHEET METAL WORKERS' JOINT APPRENTICESHIP FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' PENSION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' SUPPLEMENTAL UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFIT (S.U.B.) FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' VACATION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19..(MILZ, MARTIN) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Praecipe/Request
Tue 03/27 3:19 PM
For Entry of Default Request by GARY MASINO, SHEET METAL WORKERS' ANNUITY FUND: OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' INTERNATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTE (ITI), SHEET METAL WORKERS' JOINT APPRENTICESHIP FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' PENSION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' SUPPLEMENTAL UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFIT (S.U.B.) FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' VACATION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19. (MILZ, MARTIN) |
|
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 03/27 4:35 PM
DEFAULT BY CAMDEN MECHANICAL LLC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (fdc, ) |
||
misc
Default Entered
Tue 03/27 4:35 PM
Default Entered (fdc, ) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/09 10:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEET METAL WORKERS' JOINT APPRENTICESHIP FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, SHEET METAL WORKERS' PENSION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' VACATION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' SUPPLEMENTAL UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFIT (S.U.B.) FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, GARY MASINO, SHEET METAL WORKERS' INTERNATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTE (ITI), SHEET METAL WORKERS' ANNUITY FUND: OF LOCAL NO. 19 re: Michael Damiano served Summons and Complaint upon All Defendants by Proof of Service. All Defendants. (MILZ, MARTIN) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 03/08 11:01 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by GARY MASINO as to CAMDEN MECHANICAL LLC. (jaa, ) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/16 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT against CAMDEN MECHANICAL LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 173637.), filed by SHEET METAL WORKERS' JOINT APPRENTICESHIP FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, SHEET METAL WORKERS' PENSION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' VACATION FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' SUPPLEMENTAL UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFIT (S.U.B.) FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL 19, SHEET METAL WORKERS' HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF LOCAL NO. 19, GARY MASINO, SHEET METAL WORKERS' INTERNATIONAL TRAINING INSTITUTE (ITI), SHEET METAL WORKERS' ANNUITY FUND: OF LOCAL NO. 19.(ahf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheets | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/16 3:09 PM
Summons Issued as to CAMDEN MECHANICAL LLC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/16/2018. (ahf) |