Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:18-cv-01487 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 18, 2018 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Fri 07/27 9:40 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 7/26/2018 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/26 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) John Doe. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 05/16 11:30 AM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. Service due by 8/14/2018. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/16/2018) (mml) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 05/15 7:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time within Which to Effectuate Service on Defendant addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jacqueline M. James. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Memo Endorsement
Mon 03/26 3:13 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:11 Letter filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/26/2018) (ap) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 03/22 12:04 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting8 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. ENDORSEMENT: Motion is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/20/2018) (mml) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 03/21 3:45 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jacqueline M. James dated March 21, 2018 re: Request to Withdraw Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Sunday, March 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Sun 03/18 6:27 PM
NOTICE of of Related Cases. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
9 | 9
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Sun 03/18 6:26 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
8 | 8
motion
Discovery
Sun 03/18 6:24 PM
MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Tue 02/20 3:33 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 02/20 3:27 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 02/20 3:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 02/20 3:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient AO 120/121 Form
Tue 02/20 3:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James re: Document No. 4 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Docket Number field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney. Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies. (sj) |
||
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Mon 02/19 5:11 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/19 5:09 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 02/19 5:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/19 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14715220)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |