Cannon v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01699 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 18, 2018 3:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Edward Cannon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 09/21 2:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice- originally filed as rec. doc. 17829 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/9/2020.(dw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Thu 03/15 1:36 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/12 10:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG. (aj) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 02/26 1:59 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG filed by Edward Cannon re1 Complaint,,. (Sims, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 02/20 10:20 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/19 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6667024) filed by Edward Cannon.Attorney Thomas M Sims added to party Edward Cannon(pty:pla).(Sims, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bayer Pharma AG |