Bevin et al v. Stewart et al
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory F Vantatenhove |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00008 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 18, 2018 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dave Kobersmith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Woods
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly Withers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronnie Maurice Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda Spears
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Roode
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quenton Radford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheila Marlene Penney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sara Woods
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shawna Nicole McComas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glassie Mae Kasey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alexa Hatcher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lakin Branham
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shanna Ballinger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katelyn Allen
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Kentucky Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen P. Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott W. Brinkman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
1. | Bevin administration responds to lawsuit seeking to block Medicaid waver plan by countering with another lawsuit (insiderlouisville.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/21/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment
Mon 08/20 10:32 AM
JUDGMENT: 1. Judgment is ENTERED in favor of the Defendants; 2. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE ORDER and there is no just cause for delay; and 3. All issues having been resolved, this case is STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/20/2018.(CBD) |
|
37 | 37
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Intervene
Mon 08/20 10:30 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss25 is GRANTED; 2) Judgment in favor of Defendants shall be entered contemporaneously herewith; 3) Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc.s Motion to Intervene4 is DENIED AS MOOT; and 4) Kentucky Hospital Associations Motion to Intervene7 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/20/2018. (CBD) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
16
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/29 2:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION to Dismiss by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart filed by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods. |
|
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 05/29 9:12 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re25 MOTION to Dismiss by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart. (AKR) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
28
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/07 10:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Dismiss by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart filed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller.(Pitt, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/01 4:03 PM
ORDER: 1. Plaintiffs shall have to and including May 7, 2018, to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss25 ; and 2. Defendants shall have to and including May 28, 2018, to reply to Plaintiffs' Response. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/1/2018.(AKR) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Mon 04/30 10:41 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re33 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller (CBD) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation
Fri 04/27 3:55 PM
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller. (Kuhn, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 04/24 8:36 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re7 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Hospital Association (CBD) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 04/24 8:49 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re4 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc. (CBD) |
||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Tue 04/24 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Brent Baughman re31 Response in Support of Motion. Error: the reply to4 was incorrectly filed using the event "response." Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of31 to state, "incorrectly filed." Attorney having filed the reply at32 using correct event no further action is required. cc cc: COR (CBD) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/23 5:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc. filed by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc.. (Baughman, Brent) |
|
31 | 31
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 04/23 5:03 PM
RESPONSE in Support re4 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc. filed by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc.. (Baughman, Brent) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/23 12:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Hospital Association filed by Kentucky Hospital Association. (Butler, Wesley) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order Terminate Motions
Wed 04/11 12:50 PM
ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. 22] is GRANTED; and 2. Samuel Brooke is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for the defendants in the above styled action.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/11/2018.(AKR) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 04/10 10:48 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re22 MOTION for Samuel Brooke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CBD) |
||
misc
Clerk's Note
Tue 04/10 1:29 PM
Clerk's Note: re28 Response in Opposition to Motion - Clerk has verified by phone with counsel that this pleading is a duplicate of DE 26. (AKR) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/09 6:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Hospital Association filed by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods. |
|
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/09 6:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc. filed by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods. |
|
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/09 6:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Hospital Association filed by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods. |
|
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/09 6:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods |
|
Att: 1 23 pgs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/09 1:25 PM
NOTICE OF FILING by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods re22 MOTION for Samuel Brooke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
misc
Bar Status Check
Mon 04/09 9:02 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Samuel Brooke re22 MOTION for Samuel Brooke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda. (CBD) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 04/09 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Anne Regan re22 MOTION for Samuel Brooke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days , prepare a pleading entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (CBD) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/06 4:39 PM
ORDER: that Defendants shall have to and including April 9, 2018, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and the motion to intervene filed by Kentucky Association of Health Plans. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/6/2018.(AKR) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/06 11:17 AM
MOTION for Samuel Brooke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4042237) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Thu 04/05 9:13 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re21 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding Filing Responsive Pleading to Complaint (Doc No 1) and Response to Motion to Intervene (Doc No. 4) by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey. (AKR) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation
Wed 04/04 2:42 PM
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding Filing Responsive Pleading to Complaint (Doc No 1) and Response to Motion to Intervene (Doc No. 4) by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods. |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 6:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via 03/15/18 to Sheila Marlene Penney served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018.(Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 USPS Tracking | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 5:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Certified Mail to Shawna Nicole McComas served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018.(Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 5:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Certified Mail to Quenton Radford served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018.(Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 5:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Personal by Sheriff to Alexa Hatcher served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 5:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Personal by Sheriff to David Roode served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 5:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Personal by Sheriff to Amanda Spears served on 3/16/2016, answer due 4/6/2016. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 4:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Personal by Sheriff to Shanna Ballinger served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 4:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Personal by Sheriff to Dave Kobersmith served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 4:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Personal by Sheriff to Sara Woods served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 3:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller via Personal by Sheriff to Michael Woods served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/02 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Bevin via Personal by Sheriff to Lakin Branham served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Kleinert, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/28 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 03/28 3:02 PM
Attorney Update. Attorney Cara L. Stewart for Katelyn Allen,Cara L. Stewart for Shanna Ballinger,Cara L. Stewart for William Bennett,Cara L. Stewart for Lakin Branham,Cara L. Stewart for Alexa Hatcher,Cara L. Stewart for Glassie Mae Kasey,Cara L. Stewart for Dave Kobersmith,Cara L. Stewart for Shawna Nicole McComas,Cara L. Stewart for Sheila Marlene Penney,Cara L. Stewart for Quenton Radford,Cara L. Stewart for David Roode,Cara L. Stewart for Amanda Spears,Cara L. Stewart for Ronnie Maurice Stewart,Cara L. Stewart for Kimberly Withers,Cara L. Stewart for Michael Woods,Cara L. Stewart for Sara Woods added. (AKR) |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Mon 03/26 10:34 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re4 MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc. . (AKR) |
||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 03/23 8:40 AM
Attorney Update. Attorney Holly R. Iaccarino for Kentucky Hospital Association added. (CBD) |
||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Thu 03/22 6:52 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Hospital Association. (Butler, Wesley) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Intervene
Thu 03/22 6:50 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Hospital Association(Butler, Wesley) |
|
Att: 1 26 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Tendered Intervening Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
misc
Clerk's Note
Mon 03/12 1:34 PM
Clerk's Note re6 Summons Issued: Clerk failed to attach the summons for Katelyn Allen at DE3 . Summons was issued and filed at DE6 . (SCD) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 03/02 4:58 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc.. (Baughman, Brent) |
|
4 | 4
4
pgs
motion
Intervene
Fri 03/02 4:54 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Kentucky Association of Health Plans, Inc.(Baughman, Brent) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit A - Intervening Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/20 4:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Katelyn Allen, Shanna Ballinger, William Bennett, Lakin Branham, Alexa Hatcher, Glassie Mae Kasey, Dave Kobersmith, Shawna Nicole McComas, Sheila Marlene Penney, Quenton Radford, David Roode, Amanda Spears, Ronnie Maurice Stewart, Kimberly Withers, Michael Woods, Sara Woods; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (SCD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/20 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Matthew G. Bevin, Scott W. Brinkman, Stephen P. Miller. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4006096)(SCD) (SCD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copy of Waiver Application, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Copy of Modified Proposal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Copy of Approval, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Executive Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Copy of Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Copy of Motion to Transfer, | ||
Att: 7 Summons to be issued for Katelyn Allen, | ||
Att: 8 Summons to be issued for Shanna Ballinger, | ||
Att: 9 Summons to be issued for William Bennett, | ||
Att: 10 Summons to be issued for Lakin Branham, | ||
Att: 11 Summons to be issued for Alexa Hatcher, | ||
Att: 12 Summons to be issued for Glassie Mae Kasey, | ||
Att: 13 Summons to be issued for Dave Kobersmith, | ||
Att: 14 Summons to be issued for Michael Woods, | ||
Att: 15 Summons to be issued for Shawna Nicole McComas, | ||
Att: 16 Summons to be issused for Sheila Marlene Penney, | ||
Att: 17 Summons to be issued for Quenton Radford, | ||
Att: 18 Summons to be issued for David Roode, | ||
Att: 19 Summons to be issused for Sara Woods, | ||
Att: 20 Summons to be issued for Amanda Spears, | ||
Att: 21 Summons to be issued for Kimberly Withers, | ||
Att: 22 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 23 (2/20/2018) Summons to be issued for Ronnie Maurice Stewart | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Tue 02/20 3:55 PM
Conflict Check run. (SCD) |