Tops Holding II Corporation
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 7:18-bk-22279 |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 09, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tops Holding II Corporation
6363 Main Street
Williamsville, NY 14221 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:14 PM EST |
Attorney
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153 |
Represented By
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor www.epiqsystems.com
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Creditor
1760 Wehrle Drive LLC
5505 Main Street
Williamsville, NY 14221 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
225 East Main Street LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
9 Mechanic Street LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
A.B.C. Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Amherst Station II LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ankura Trust Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Barclay Damon LLP
125 E. Jefferson Street
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bath Center I LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Benderson Development Co LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Benenson Capital Partners, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Board of Trustees U.F.C.W. Local 1500 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees U.F.C.W. Local 1500 Welfare Fund and Board of Trustees U.F.C.W. Local 1500 Legal Services Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bottling Group, LLC and its affiliates and subsidiaries, operating as Pepsi Beverages Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bullseye Telecom, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
C. Gershon Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Canastota Center I LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CoFinance Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cooperstown Realty Partners, LLC
103 Godwin Avenue Suite 193
Midland Park, NJ 07432 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Core-Mark International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, as DIP Term Loan Agent
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crosby-Brownlie, Inc.
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DIP Term Loan Lender Group and the Ad Hoc Committee fo Senior Secured Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DLC Management Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dansville SSG, LLC
PO Box 778
Armonk, NY 10504 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
EnergyMark, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Estate of Kevin Darrington
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Excellus Blue Cross/Blue Shield
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Farmington Center LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Foothills Management, Inc.
54 State Street
Albany, NY 12207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Forgham Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fulton Market LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hannibal Acquisitions LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joyce Higgins
Rish, Intelisano & Katz, LLP 915 Broadway Suite 900
New York, NY 10010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Brotherhood of Teamsters
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JADD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LaGrange Center LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lancaster Central School District
333 West Washington St., Suite 20
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levin Properties, L.P.
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Local 464A United Food and Commercial Workers Educational Benefit Fund
245 Paterson Ave
Little Falls, NJ 07424 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Local 464A United Food and Commercial Workers Welfare Service Benefit Fund
245 Paterson Ave
Little Falls, NJ 07424 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Madison Avenue Realties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morgan Adams LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morgan Boonville LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morgan Clifton LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morgan Newfane LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 20
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
NYS Department of Taxation & Finance
15 MetroTech Center
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Labor Relations Board, Region 3
Leo W. O'Brien Federal Building 11A Clinton Avenue, Room 342
Albany, NY 12207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Neave Landscaping, Inc.
80 Airport Drive
Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Neu Lac de Ville Plaza, LLC
Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP 2 State Street Suite 700
Rochester, NY 14614 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Paltz Properties, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York State Dep't of Taxation and Finance
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York State Department of Labor
|
|
Creditor
New York State Teamsters Conference Pension & Retirement Fund
Paravati, Karl, Green & DeBella, LLP 520 Seneca Street Suite 105
Utica, NY 13502 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Niagara Falls Water Board
424 Main Street Suite 1600
Buffalo, NY 14202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
North Creek Center LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Northfield Center LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PDQ Properties Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Perry's Ice Cream Company Inc.
Rupp Baase Pfalzagraf Cunningham 424 Main Street Suite 1600
Buffalo, NY 14202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pulaski Center I LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
RIC Rhinebeck Associates LLC
411 Hackensack Avenue
Hackensack, NJ 07601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Realty Income Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Reid Petroleum Corp.
Attn: Stephen A. Donato, Esq. One Lincoln Center
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
River Valley Foods, Inc.
5881 Court Street Road
Syracuse, NY 13206 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
S&R Company of West Seneca
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
S&R Company of West Seneca Newco, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Salarino's Italian Foods, Inc.
James Street P. O. Box 565
Canastota, NY 13021 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Schmitt Sales, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Schwebel Baking Company
965 E. Midlothian Blvd.
Youngstown, OH 44501 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Smith Provision Company, Inc.
1890 West 20th Street
Erie, PA 16502 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Supermarket Management Inc.
460 Niagara Street
Buffalo, NY 14201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sure Winner Foods
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson, P.A. 100 Middle Street P.O. Box 9729
Portland, ME 04104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TK Landlords
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Irene Thomas
|
|
Creditor
Topco Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Topco Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tops Portfolio, LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Transit Road Acquisitions LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UFCW District Union Local One
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UFCW Local 464A
245 Paterson Ave.
Little Falls, NJ 07424 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UFCW Local One 401(k) Savings Fund
5911 Airport Road
Oriskany, NY 13424 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UFCW Local One Benefit Funds
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UFCW Local One Health Care Fund
5911 Airport Road
Oriskany, NY 13424 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UFCW Local One Pension Fund
5911 Airport Road
Oriskany, NY 13424 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UFCW Local Union 1500
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Food and Commercial Workers International Union
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Food and Commercial Workers International Union Local 464A Pension Fund
245 Paterson Ave.
Little Falls, NJ 07424 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Memorial Medical Center
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Natural Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Upstate Niagara Cooperative, Inc.
Attn: John A. Mueller 50 Fountain Plaza Suite 1700
Buffalo, NY 14202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WARREN MARKET STREET LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
350 Fifth Avenue Suite 5330
New York, NY 10118 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services, LLC
P.O. Box 13708
Macon, GA 31208 |
|
Creditor
Westfield Center LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Morrison & Foerster LLP 250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Zolfo Cooper, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Ahold U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
DXC Technology Services LLC, formerly known as HP Enterprise Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Maribeth W. Druse
|
|
Interested Party
Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection
400 Market Street
Harrisburg, PA 17101 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Portage Land Corporation
240 South 13th Avenue
Coatsville, PA 19320 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Southpaw Asset Management LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TR Capital Management LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Ankura Trust Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Deloitte Tax LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Morrison & Foerster LLP
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
c/o Garry M. Graber Hodgson Russ LLP
Special Co-Counsel to the Debtors 140 Pearl Street Suite 100
Buffalo, NY 14202 |
Represented By
|
Transferee
Shoreline Capital, LLC
345 E. 80th Street #19EF
New York, NY 10075 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Linda Adams
69 Crum Elbow Road
Hyde Park, NY 12538 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Angola Center LLC
333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Cavallaro Foods, LLC
5881 Court Street Road
Syracuse, NY 13206 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
DELOITTE & TOUCHE LLP
4152 Collection Center Drive
Chicago, IL 60693 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Deloitte Tax LLP
Two World Financial Center
New York, NY 10281 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Evercore Group L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
FTI Consulting Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Kreher's Farm Fresh Eggs, LLC
5411 Davison Road
Clarence, NY 14031 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Jeanette Makarainen
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
New York State Electric and Gas Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Pennsylvania Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Putnam Plaza II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Putnam Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Rochester Gas & Electric Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
TOMRA of North America, Inc.
Wilson Elser 1133 Westchester Ave Building C
White Plains, NY 10604 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
UB Putnam, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
West Penn Power Company
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 12 2022
Written Opinion signed on 10/12/2022 RE: Memorandum of Decision on Motions to Dismiss. (This Refers to Adv. Case 20-8950). (Tavarez, Arturo) |
1. | Court confirms Tops reorganization (pressrepublican.com) |
Submitted Mon 11/12/2018 | |
2. | Tops Markets Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/22/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1005 | 1005
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Tue 04/16 12:35 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-22285 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Ligee Gu on behalf of Alan D. Halperin, as Litigation Trustee of the GUC Litigation Trust. (Gu, Ligee) |
|
1004 | 1004
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Tue 04/16 12:33 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Ligee Gu on behalf of Alan D. Halperin, as Litigation Trustee of the GUC Litigation Trust. (Gu, Ligee) |