BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al v. Claimant ID 100027528
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carl Barbier |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01809 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:2701 - Oil Pollution Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 19, 2018 3:21 AM CDT |
Interested Party
Claims Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lead Class Counsel
|
Represented By
|
Objecting Party
Claimant ID 100027528
|
Represented By
|
Requesting Party
BP America Production Company
|
Represented By
|
Requesting Party
BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Requesting Party
BP p.l.c.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 02/21 9:00 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) |