PruvIT Ventures, Inc. v. Elevacity, LLC et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Referred: | Kimberly C Priest Johnson |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00119 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 20, 2018 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Elevacity, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Oblon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PruvIT Ventures, Inc.
901 Sam Rayburn Highway
Melissa, TX 75454 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Fri 07/13 10:09 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT letter received by the Collin County 296th District Court on 7/6/2018. New case number 296-00472-2018. (baf, ) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 06/25 4:57 PM
REMAND letter, certified copy of Memorandum Adopting Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge23 and certified copy of docket sheet mailed to the 296th Judicial District Court of Collin County, Texas. (baf, ) |
||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 06/05 11:51 AM
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for19 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART6 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by PruvIT Ventures, Inc. This case is hereby REMANDED to the 296th Judicial District Court of Collin County, Texas, as Cause No. 296-00472-2018, for further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set for June 27, 2018, before United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly Priest Johnson is hereby CANCELED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/5/2018. (baf, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 05/29 4:50 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens' Participation Act : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. GRANTING21 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens' Participation Act filed by PruvIT Ventures, Inc. Responses due by 6/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/29/2018. (baf, ) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/25 8:57 AM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens' Participation Act by PruvIT Ventures, Inc..(Hill, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/24 12:03 PM
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** STIPULATION Concerning Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act by PruvIT Ventures, Inc.. (Hill, Mark) Modified on 5/24/2018 (baf, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 05/24 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATION submitted DOCUMENT20 - A MOTION IS REQUIRED TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, ) |
||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Report and Recommendations
Mon 05/21 4:00 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re6 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support filed by PruvIT Ventures, Inc. The Court recommends that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt.6 ) be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/21/2018. (baf, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/25 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna Solveig Brooks on behalf of PruvIT Ventures, Inc. (Brooks, Anna) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 04/20 4:52 PM
ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART15 Motion to Stay TCPA Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/20/2018. (baf, ) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/16 5:11 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion (Dkt.14 ) is GRANTED and the Order Governing Proceedings (Dkt.9 ) in this matter is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/16/2018. (baf, ) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stay
Mon 04/16 3:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay re13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens' Participation Act by PruvIT Ventures, Inc..(Hill, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/06 1:56 PM
Joint MOTION for temporary relief from order governing proceedings by Elevacity, LLC, Robert Oblon.(Slovak, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/02 5:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens' Participation Act by Elevacity, LLC, Robert Oblon.(Slovak, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/27 4:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by PruvIT Ventures, Inc..(Hill, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Rob DeBoer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Statement of Policies and Procedures | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Tue 03/27 4:27 PM
RESPONSE in Support re6 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support filed by PruvIT Ventures, Inc. . (Hill, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 03/20 5:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support filed by Elevacity, LLC, Robert Oblon . (Slovak, Robert) |
|
9 | 9
10
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 03/20 2:04 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/29/2018 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 4/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/20/2018. (baf, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/07 3:45 PM
ORDER - GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/7/2018. (baf, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/06 3:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss and, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Brief in Support by PruvIT Ventures, Inc..(Hill, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 03/06 3:13 PM
Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support by PruvIT Ventures, Inc..(Hill, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Wed 02/28 4:23 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf, ) |
||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Thu 02/22 3:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Elevacity, LLC, Robert Oblon. (Slovak, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
Thu 02/22 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Robert T Slovak on behalf of Elevacity, LLC, Robert Oblon (Slovak, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
94
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/22 1:12 PM
***AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elevacity, LLC, Robert Oblon, filed by PruvIT Ventures, Inc..(baf, ) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/22 1:10 PM
***COMPLIANT FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Elevacity, LLC, Robert Oblon, filed by PruvIT Ventures, Inc..(baf, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/21 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Oblon, Elevacity, LLC from 296th District Court, case number 296-00472-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6669912), filed by Robert Oblon, Elevacity, LLC.(Slovak, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (1 of 2) - Certified Record, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A (2 of 2) - Certified Record | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/21 5:38 PM
Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, ) |