New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:18-cv-01662
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2018
Terminated:Jul 19, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 21, 2018 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Fox News Network, LLC
Represented By
Dori Ann Hanswirth
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer Llp (nyc)
contact info
Sara Lynn Shudofsky
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer Llp (nyc)
contact info
Kyle Douglas Gooch
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Luc Burbon
Represented By
Avi Naveh
Law Office Of Avi A. Naveh, Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/15/2019 11:59 PM EST
Friday, August 24, 2018
19 19 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Fri 4:57 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the parties to this action, by and through their undersigned counsel, that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its or their own legal fees and costs. So ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/24/2018) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
18 18 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 4:09 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Hanswirth, Dori)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 12:48 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. All filing deadlines and conference dates are adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/16/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 14, 2018
16 16 misc Letter Sat 9:13 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Avi Naveh dated 07/14/2018 re: Parties joint request to stay proceedings pending settlement. Document filed by Luc Burbon.(Naveh, Avi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 3:03 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY JULY 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 1:24 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Dori Ann Hanswirth dated June 13, 2018. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(Hanswirth, Dori)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 11:53 AM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY JUNE 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
12 12 motion Extension of Time Thu 12:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Dori Ann Hanswirth dated May 10, 2018. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(Hanswirth, Dori)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dori Ann Hanswirth on behalf of Fox News Network, LLC. New Address: Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP, 250 West 55th Street, New York, New York, USA 10019-9710, (212) 836-8095. (Hanswirth, Dori)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 4:35 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY MAY 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 10:44 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Dori Ann Hanswirth dated March 28, 2018. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(Hanswirth, Dori)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle Douglas Gooch on behalf of Fox News Network, LLC. (Gooch, Kyle)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Lynn Shudofsky on behalf of Fox News Network, LLC. (Shudofsky, Sara)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dori Ann Hanswirth on behalf of Fox News Network, LLC. (Hanswirth, Dori)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 10:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fox News Network, LLC. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 10:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 10:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 10:32 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 8:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fox News Network, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Luc Burbon. (Naveh, Avi)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 8:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Naveh, Avi)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 8:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Fox News Network, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14733674)Document filed by Luc Burbon.(Naveh, Avi)
Related: [-]