Wells Fargo Bank National Association v. L L Holdings Inc et al
Alabama Northern District Court | |
Judge: | R David Proctor |
Case #: | 7:14-cv-00128 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 7:17 AM CST |
Defendant
L L Holdings Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lary L Lasswell
Trans National Paper 5855 E Casper Rd
Mesa, AZ 85205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Polar Paper Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/25/2015 11:22 AM CST |
Tuesday, January 21, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against L L Holdings Inc, Lary L Lasswell, Polar Paper Products Inc, filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association.(KAM, ) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibiti E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2014 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2091790. related document1 COMPLAINT against L L Holdings Inc, Lary L Lasswell, Polar Paper Products Inc, filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association.(KAM, ). (Pruitt, Eric) | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2091790. related document1 COMPLAINT against L L Holdings Inc, Lary L Lasswell, Polar Paper Products Inc, filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Pruitt, Eric) Modified on 1/23/2014 to reflect USDC Receipt #B4601049875 (CTS, ). |