Jacqueline Cooley, et al v. HMR of Alabama, Inc.
Original Case: 4:16-cv-01432
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-prici-10657 |
Type | private civil / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 23, 2018 3:21 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
HMR OF ALABAMA, INC., d.b.a. Robert L. Howard Veterans Home
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANGELA MCCRAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SARAH MARBURY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARGARET MIXON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
VANESSA MOTEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATRICIA PARKS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DENETHA PETTY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BETTY PHILLIPS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATRICIA ROBINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TOINETTA SUTTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHERVON TANNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TRENEIA TOYER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLARISSA TRUSS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SUJUTORIA TRUSS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CAMEKA TURNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID VAUGHAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DEBRA VAUGHAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JILL VAUGHAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATRICIA WALLACE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CONSTANCE WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANGELA WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RUBY WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDREA WOOD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LEASA GOWERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
HEATHER ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROSIE BOYD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
EBONY BYERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHAKELIA CALHOUN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KIMBERLY CAMPBELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MYRANIA CARLTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JEWELL CHANDLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JALYSA EMBRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
APRIL EVANS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
VONCEL FREEMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JACQUELINE COOLEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TASHA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CECELIA HAWKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ELLEON HERRING
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALMELIA HILL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHNNIE HOLLIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHANELLE HURRELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
REGINA ISAAC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TRAVIS IVY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANGELA JONES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SANTRECIA KELLY
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 06 2018
Opinion issued by court as to Appellants Heather Adams, Rosie Boyd, Ebony Byers, Shakelia Calhoun, Kimberly Campbell, Myrania Carlton, Jewell Chandler, Jacqueline Cooley, Jalysa Embry, April Evans, Voncel Freeman, Leasa Gowers, Tasha Harris, Cecelia Hawkins, Elleon Herring, Almelia Hill, Johnnie Hollis, Shanelle Hurrell, Regina Isaac, Travis Ivy, Angela Jones, Santrecia Kelly, Sarah Marbury, Angela McCray, Margaret Mixon, Vanessa Moten, Patricia Parks, Denetha Petty, Betty Phillips, Patricia Robinson, Toinetta Sutton, Chervon Tanner, Treneia Toyer, Clarissa Truss, Sujutoria Truss, Cameka Turner, David Vaughan, Debra Vaughan, Jill Vaughan, Patricia Wallace, Constance Williams, Angela Wilson, Ruby Wilson and Andrea Wood. Decision: Affirmed in part Reversed and Remanded in part. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.--[Edited 09/06/2018 by DC] |
Docket last updated: 02/23/2018 3:21 AM EST |