Casa Capri Recovery, Inc. v. City of Costa Mesa
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-00329 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 25, 2018 2:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Costa Mesa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Casa Capri Recovery Inc
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit alleges Costa Mesa's sober-living regulations are discriminatory and unconstitutional (latimes.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/23/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago |
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
202 | 202
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Tue 04/19 11:58 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals141 filed by Casa Capri Recovery Inc. CCA # 20-55334 Appellant's motion (Docket Entry No. 63) for voluntary dismissal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court acts as the mandate of this court. (car) |