DeBose v. Ellucian, L.P. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth A Kovachevich |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-00473 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 26, 2018 4:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Andrea Diamond
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ellucian, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela W. DeBose
1107 W Kirby St
Tampa, FL 33604 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
49 | 49
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 11/21 1:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 48 Motion for § 1447(c) Costs and Expenses and Rule 11 Sanctions. Defendants did not lack an objectively reasonable basis for seeking removal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/21/2018. (RLH) |
|
Saturday, November 17, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Sat 11/17 5:19 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Section 1447(c) Costs and Expenses and/or Rule 11 Sanctions for Improper Removal by Angela W. DeBose.(DeBose, Angela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/26 2:19 PM
Transmittal of Record to State Court Received. (LNR) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
19
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Wed 10/17 1:51 PM
ORDER granting 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida. The Clerk is directed to close the case and terminate any pending motions. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 10/17/2018. (RLH) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 08/13 10:21 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 44 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 8/13/2018. (RLH) |
|
Sunday, August 12, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Leave to File Document
Sun 08/12 10:30 PM
MOTION for leave to file Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion to Remand by Angela W. DeBose. (DeBose, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
respoth
Response
Tue 08/07 3:39 PM
RESPONSE re37 Supplement TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL TO MOTION TO REMAND filed by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/06 12:47 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re39 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Angela W. DeBose. (DeBose, Angela) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 07/30 4:30 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendants' reply shall be filed on or before August 9, 2018, and shall not exceed five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/30/2018. (RLH) |
|
40 | 40
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 07/30 3:36 PM
MOTION for leave to file TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO REMAND by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Beyer, Nancy) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/27 1:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
adr
Notice of selection of mediator
Thu 07/26 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Mark A. Hanley as mediator by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Supplement
Tue 07/17 7:35 AM
SUPPLEMENT re8 MOTION to remand to State Court by Angela W. DeBose. (DeBose, Angela) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on motion to supplement
Mon 07/16 11:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 35 Motion to supplement. The Court previously granted Plaintiff permission to file a supplement to her motion to remand to the extent that the allegations contained in her amended complaint affect and/or alter the arguments made in her motion to remand. See Doc. 33. Therefore, to the extent that the allegations contained in Plaintiff's amended complaint do, in fact, affect and/or alter the arguments made in her motion to remand, Plaintiff shall, on or before July 18, 2018, file a supplement that so indicates. If, on the other hand, the arguments made in her motion to remand remain otherwise unaffected by the filing of her amended complaint, Plaintiff shall file a supplement that so indicates. In any event, Plaintiff's supplement shall not exceed five (5) pages in length, and Plaintiff shall not reiterate arguments previously made in her pending motion to remand. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/16/2018. (RLH) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Supplement
Mon 07/16 12:58 AM
STRIKEN, pursuant to court's order 36 MOTION to supplement Motion to Remand Supplemental Brief Filed by Angela W. DeBose.(DeBose, Angela) Modified on 7/16/2018 (LNR) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Master Services Agreement | ||
34 | 34
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/16 12:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Angela DeBose against Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P. with Jury Demand. filed by Angela W. DeBose.(DeBose, Angela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
*Order no pdf
Tue 07/10 5:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER that Plaintiff shall file, or before July 20, 2018, a supplement to 8 her Motion to Remand ("Motion") that indicates whether and to what extent her to-be-filed amended complaint effects the arguments made in her Motion. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/10/2018. (RLH) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on motion to dismiss
Tue 07/10 5:33 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 3 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint based on 30 the Court's 7/10/2018 Endorsed Order granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/10/2018. (RLH) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on motion to supplement
Tue 07/10 5:29 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Record In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/10/2018. (RLH) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 07/10 5:20 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Any amended complaint shall be filed on or before July 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/10/2018. (RLH) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Supplement
Mon 07/09 11:05 PM
MOTION to supplement Record In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by Angela W. DeBose. (DeBose, Angela) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/09 11:18 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 06/26 11:06 PM
MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint by Angela W. DeBose.(DeBose, Angela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
*Order no pdf
Mon 06/25 11:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 25 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for failure to comply with the provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a). Should Plaintiff wish to re-file her Amended Complaint, she is directed to either (1) gain Defendants' consent to do so, or (2) file an appropriate motion with the Court. The Clerk is directed to terminate the filing. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/25/2018. (RLH) |
|
Sunday, June 24, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/25 12:00 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Angela W. DeBose.(DeBose, Angela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Ellucian Contract with USFBOT, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Ellucian-Diamond Consulting Agreement with USFBOT | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order on motion for recusal
Tue 06/05 3:09 PM
ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Recusal of Presiding Judge. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/5/2018. (RLH) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Recusal
Thu 05/31 12:13 AM
MOTION for Recusal and Reconsideration by Angela W. DeBose. (DeBose, Angela) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Case management and scheduling order
Wed 05/23 10:03 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 6/25/2018; Discovery due by 1/31/2019; Dispositive motions due by 3/4/2019; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 11/21/2018; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/21/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Trial set for term commencing 8/5/2019. The parties anticipate a JURY TRIAL will take 3 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/15/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/23/2018. (SRC) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Mon 05/21 12:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order Granting Transfer. The Court construes Plaintiff's Motion as a request to transfer this case back to U.S. District Judge Steven D. Merryday. Plaintiff's Motion is denied. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/21/2018. (RLH) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Case Management Report
Mon 05/21 12:32 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/09 11:25 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Vacate filed by Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Vacate
Tue 03/27 11:11 AM
MOTION to Vacate Order Granting Transfer by Angela DeBose. (LMD) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/22 4:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Mon 03/19 11:40 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/19/2018. (SRC) |
|
15 | 15
order
Standing Order re: 25 pages
Mon 03/19 9:55 AM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LMD) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/16 10:07 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. New case number: 8:18cv473 T-17AAS. Judge Steven D. Merryday no longer assigned to the case. (DG) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order reassigning case to another judge w/in division
Thu 03/15 2:05 PM
ORDER reassigning this action to the Honorable Elizabeth Kovachevich for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/15/2018. (BK) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 03/14 10:09 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to transfer case RELATED CASE filed by Angela DeBose. (DG) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Transfer case
Mon 03/12 9:53 AM
MOTION to transfer case RELATED CASE by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/08 9:51 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Angela DeBose. (DG) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Thu 03/08 9:46 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Angela DeBose. (DG) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Remand to State Court
Thu 03/08 9:43 AM
MOTION to remand to State Court by Angela DeBose. (DG) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
11
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/02 4:19 PM
ORDER re 6 notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/2/2018. (GSO) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of designation of track
Fri 03/02 4:15 PM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (GSO) |
|
Att: 1 (3/2/2018) Main Document | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 02/28 1:12 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. Related case(s): n (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 02/28 1:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P.. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Wed 02/28 11:24 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P. (DG) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/28 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P. with Jury Demand filed by Angela DeBose.(DG) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/28 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, case number 18-CA-000893 filed in State Court on 1/29/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA-49060 filed by Andrea Diamond, Ellucian, L.P..(DG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |