G&L Partners International Trade v. Fleet Export, Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-60458 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 29, 2018 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Michael Downs
|
|
Defendant
Fleet Export, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
G&L Partners International Trade
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 11/07 10:01 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of G&L Partners International Trade against Fleet Export, Inc., Michael Downs Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (isc) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 11/07 9:58 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of G&L Partners International Trade against Fleet Export, Inc., Michael Downs. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (isc) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Judgment
Thu 11/01 5:00 PM
MOTION for Judgment Proposed Order for Default Judgment by G&L Partners International Trade. (Criscione, Galen) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/01 8:02 AM
Reset Deadlines/ Per DE#25. Miscellaneous Deadline 11/16/2018. (cqs) |
||
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Administrative Order
Wed 10/31 5:46 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of24 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall file a proposed order on default judgment on or before November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/31/2018. (isc) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 10/31 3:46 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by G&L Partners International Trade.(Criscione, Galen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Attorney Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Military Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 09/19 9:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before October 31, 2018, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/19/2018. (hmo) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 09/18 10:26 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time File Motion for Final Default by G&L Partners International Trade. Responses due by 10/2/2018 (Criscione, Galen) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default - FORM
Fri 09/07 10:59 AM
ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re20 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Fleet Export, Inc, Michael Downs per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Re: 19 Order,,,. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (lh) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 09/06 6:32 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Michael Downs, Fleet Export, Inc. by G&L Partners International Trade.(Criscione, Galen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Service of Process, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Military Service | ||
19 | 19
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 09/06 11:30 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER vacating Endorsed Order [ECF No. 12]. According to Plaintiff's Returns of Service [ECF Nos. 7 & 8], Plaintiff effectuated service of the summons and complaint on Defendants pursuant to Florida Statute 48.031(6) on March 28, 2018. Defendants, however, have failed to plead or otherwise defend this action after being served with process. Accordingly, within five (5) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file for entry of default by the Clerk as to Defendants. The Clerk is directed to treat the Returns of Service [ECF Nos. 7 & 8] as sufficient showings of executed service. Within ten (10) days of entry of default by the Clerk, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/6/2018. (hmo) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Fri 06/29 2:51 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re16 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 17 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 06/29 2:51 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by G&L Partners International Trade. Fleet Export, Inc. served on 5/30/2018, answer due 6/20/2018. See16 for image (asl) |
|
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/28 5:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G&L Partners International Trade re1 Complaint, (Criscione, Galen) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Reissued
Thu 05/24 9:00 AM
Summons Reissued as to Fleet Export, Inc.. (vmz) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Wed 05/23 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by G&L Partners International Trade re3 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, filed by G&L Partners International Trade (Criscione, Galen) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
- Endorsed Order no pdf attached
Fri 04/27 2:14 PM
ENDORSED ORDER vacating 9 Notice of Court Practice on Default Procedure. Plaintiff has failed to properly serve Defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e). Plaintiff shall perfect service on Defendants in the manner and within the time limit set forth in FRCP 4. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/27/2018. (hmo) |
|
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM
Fri 04/27 2:08 PM
Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Michael Downs, Fleet Export, Inc. - Motions Terminated:11 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,. Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - Improperly entered on docket Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/27/2018. (vmz) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 04/27 11:13 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by G&L Partners International Trade.(Criscione, Galen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Counsel Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Military Search | ||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/24 10:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G&L Partners International Trade re 9 Notice of Court Practice,,, Affirmation of Service of Court Order (Criscione, Galen) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Notice of Court Practice
Mon 04/23 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. Plaintiff effectuated service of the summons and complaint on Defendants on March 28, 2018 [ECF Nos. 7 & 8]. Defendants, however, has failed to plead or otherwise defend this action after being served with process. Accordingly, within five (5) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file for entry of default by the Clerk as to Defendants. Within ten (10) days of entry of default by the Clerk, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Plaintiffs failure to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment on or before the date set forth above may result in dismissal of the instant action. Plaintiff shall immediately provide Defendant with a copy of this Order via certified mail. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/23/2018. (hmo) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/03 11:21 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by G&L Partners International Trade. Fleet Export, Inc. served on 3/28/2018, answer due 4/18/2018. (Criscione, Galen) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/03 11:19 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by G&L Partners International Trade. Michael Downs served on 3/28/2018, answer due 4/18/2018. (Criscione, Galen) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice
Mon 03/05 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/5/2018. (hmo) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/05 8:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Michael Downs, Fleet Export, Inc.. (rms1) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/05 8:05 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) |
|
1 | 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT against Michael Downs, Fleet Export, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10454136, filed by G&L Partners International Trade.(Criscione, Galen) | |
Att: 1 Summon(s) Fleet Export Inc Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Michael Downs Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |