Great Basin Scientific, Inc.
Utah Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Joel T Marker |
Case #: | 2:18-bk-21367 |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2018 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 12, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Debtor
Great Basin Scientific, Inc.
2441 S 3850 W Ste A
Salt Lake City, UT 84120-8228 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Mary M. Hunt tr
Dorsey & Whitney 111 S. Main Street, 21st Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
|
Trustee
Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr
Strong and Hanni 102 South 200 East Suite 800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/28/2020 10:39 AM MST |
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
crditcrd
PayGov Receipt of Fee Due
Mon 03/05 4:26 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 18-21367 ( 335.00). Receipt number 20584506, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
notice
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image)
Mon 03/05 4:38 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Great Basin Scientific, Inc. (Leta, David) |
||
misc
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7
Mon 03/05 4:15 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mary M. Hunt tr, with 341(a) |
||
court
Internet Fee Due
Mon 03/05 4:22 PM
Attn: Attorney Jeff D. Tuttle. Clerk's Notice of Fee Due. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1930(b), you are required to pay a fee . An Internet Fee in the amount of $335 has already been added for you and can be paid electronically via Pay.Gov the next time you log into ECF. (jtt) |
||
Attn: Attorney Jeff D. Tuttle. Clerk's Notice of Fee Due. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1930(b), you are required to pay a fee . An Internet Fee in the amount of $335 has already been added for you and can be paid electronically via Pay.Gov the next time you log into ECF. (jtt) (EOD: 03/05/2018) | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 18-21367 ( 335.00). Receipt number 20584506, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) (EOD: 03/05/2018) | ||
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Great Basin Scientific, Inc. (Leta, David) (EOD: 03/05/2018) | ||
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mary M. Hunt tr, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/05/2018 at 405 South Main. NOTICE NOT SENT-due to resignation and appointment of trustee.(fsl) Originally entered docket 3/5/18. (fsl). (EOD: 03/08/2018) | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)
Mon 03/05 4:02 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Filed by Great Basin Scientific, Inc. (Tuttle, Jeff) (EOD: 03/05/2018) |
|
2 | 2
genaty
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Mon 03/05 4:07 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (per BR 2016). Filed by Great Basin Scientific, Inc. (Tuttle, Jeff) (EOD: 03/05/2018) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual
Mon 03/05 4:11 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Filed by Great Basin Scientific, Inc. (Tuttle, Jeff) (EOD: 03/05/2018) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice
Mon 03/05 4:24 PM
Notice of Resolution of the Board of Directors of Great Basin Scientific, Inc. to file Voluntary Bankruptcy Under Chapter 7 Filed by Great Basin Scientific, Inc. (Tuttle, Jeff) (EOD: 03/05/2018) |