CAP-XX, Ltd. v. Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Colm F Connolly |
Referred: | Sherry R Fallon |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00353 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 02, 2018 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAP-XX, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Tue 08/20 3:26 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,920,034 B2 ;US 7,382,600 B2.(fms) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - MDL - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/20 3:22 PM
ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice granting38 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and (c) with Prejudice filed by CAP-XX, Ltd., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/20/2019. (fms) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Other
Fri 08/02 3:55 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and (c) with Prejudice - filed by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Rovner, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Case Stayed
Thu 07/11 9:26 AM
SO ORDERED, re36 STIPULATION to Stay, Case stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/10/2019. (nmf) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Tue 07/09 4:45 PM
STIPULATION to Stay by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
discov
Notice of Service
Mon 06/10 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Claim Construction Disclosure filed by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Rovner, Philip) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
discov
Notice of Service
Fri 06/07 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Proposed Claim Terms and Constructions filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc., Ioxus, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
discov
Notice of Service
Fri 05/03 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Amended Invalidity Contentions filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc., Ioxus, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
order
Scheduling Order - Patent
Tue 03/19 11:00 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery. Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2019. Discovery due by 12/23/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 9/25/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/1/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial (4 days for the first case to be tried) is set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC(nmf) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Thu 03/14 5:00 PM
Letter to the Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Philip A. Rovner regarding amended scheduling order.(Rovner, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Proposed Amended Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
discov
Notice of Service
Mon 02/25 6:06 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc., Ioxus, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 02/19 9:28 AM
SO ORDERED, re (27 in 1:18-cv-00849-CFC, 28 in 1:18-cv-00353-CFC) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Amending Scheduling Order re (15 in 1:18-cv-00849-CFC, 15 in 1:18-cv-00353-CFC) Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC(nmf) |
||
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 02/19 9:39 AM
SO ORDERED, re27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley B. Summer of NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/19/2019. (nmf) |
||
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
discov
Notice of Service
Mon 02/18 8:28 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.s First Requests for Production of Documents and Defendant Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Cap-XX, Ltd. filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Fri 02/15 2:13 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Amending Scheduling Order re (15 in 1:18-cv-00849-CFC, 15 in 1:18-cv-00353-CFC) Scheduling Order,,,, by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc., Ioxus, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/15 1:57 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley B. Summer of NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP - filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
discov
Notice of Service
Thu 02/07 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CAP-XX, LTD.'s Requests for Production of Documents served on Defendant Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. filed by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Rovner, Philip) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
discov
Notice of Service
Fri 01/11 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Infringement Chart for CDE Accused Products Pursuant to Section 2(b)(iii) of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order filed by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Rovner, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Notice of Service
Wed 12/12 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 12/10 8:20 AM
SO ORDERED, re (23 in 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 24 in 1:18-cv-00849-CFC) Stipulation Amending Scheduling Order filed by CAP-XX, Ltd.. See stipulation for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC(fms) |
||
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Fri 12/07 4:18 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Amending Scheduling Order by CAP-XX, Ltd.. (Rovner, Philip) |
|
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Notice of Service
Mon 11/12 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of a Sample of Each Accused Product filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only
Mon 10/22 10:16 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at[LINK:http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation] Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC(cak) |
||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Protective Order
Wed 10/10 9:41 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC(fms) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Notice of Service
Mon 10/08 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Cap-XX, Ltd's Initial Disclosure of Accused Products and Asserted Patents and Plaintiff's Disclosures pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Rovner, Philip) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 10/05 3:40 PM
Joint PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by CAP-XX, Ltd.. (Rovner, Philip) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Fri 09/28 7:57 AM
SO ORDERED, re (18 in 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 18 in 1:18-cv-00849-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to October 5, 2018 filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc., Ioxus, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC(fms) |
||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Thu 09/27 4:53 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to October 5, 2018 - filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc., Ioxus, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
discov
Notice of Service
Tue 09/18 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Under FRCP 26(a) filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Tue 09/18 1:41 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Craig N. Killen for Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Notice of Service
Mon 09/17 5:56 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Rovner, Philip) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
order
Oral Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 09/14 9:41 AM
ORAL ORDER adopting the following dates from Judge Fallon's September 5, 2018 Scheduling Order: Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( A Markman Hearing is set for 6/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly., A Jury Trial is set for 8/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC(nmf) |
||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
order
Oral Order
Wed 09/12 12:51 PM
ORAL ORDER by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/12/2018: In light of the reassignment of this case, the Court HEREBY ORDERS that the prior referral to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon is withdrawn, with the exception that any referral to a Magistrate Judge for ADR shall remain in place. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC-SRF(nmf) |
||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Thu 09/06 12:54 PM
SO ORDERED- re13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig N. Killen. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/6/2018. (lih) |
||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order - Patent
Wed 09/05 4:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 9/11/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/24/2020. A Status Conference is set for 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon Status Report due by 3/14/2019. Tutorial on the technology due by 5/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2020. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 5/3/2019. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 5/31/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 6/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 7/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. A Jury Trial is set for 8/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC-SRF(lih) |
|
order
Oral Order
Wed 09/05 9:47 AM
ORAL ORDER- Pursuant to the joint email request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the in person rule 16 conference set in this matter for today is CONVERTED into a teleconference. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC-SRF(lih) |
||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 09/05 12:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Teleconference held on 9/5/2018. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC-SRF(lih) |
||
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 08/31 12:02 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-CFC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00849-CFC-SRF (rjb) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
11
pgs
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 08/30 6:38 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Scheduling by CAP-XX, Ltd.. (Rovner, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/29 4:00 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig N. Killen of NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP - filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Thu 08/16 4:11 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chris P. Perque,Jason P. Mueller,Maia T. Woodhouse for CAP-XX, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) |
||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
order
Oral Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/03 11:14 AM
Oral Order Setting a Joint Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a Joint Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 9/5/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the conference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a joint proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 8/30/2018. The Court's form of scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/3/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00849-VAC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00353-VAC-SRF(lih) |
||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Thu 08/02 12:36 PM
Letter to the Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Philip A. Rovner regarding scheduling conference - re (10 in 1:18-cv-00849-VAC-SRF, 11 in 1:18-cv-00353-VAC-SRF) Order. (Rovner, Philip) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/31 3:23 PM
ORDER regarding markman and discovery proceedings. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/31/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00353-VAC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00849-VAC-SRF(lih) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
order
Oral Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/02 4:22 PM
Oral Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 9/5/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the conference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 8/30/2018. The Court's form of scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/2/2018. (lih) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Mon 06/18 11:41 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michelle C. Fullmer for CAP-XX, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Wed 06/06 4:06 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CDE Holdings, Inc. for Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
9 | 9
7
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/06 4:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/6/2018 (lih). |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 05/08 9:23 AM
SO ORDERED- re8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. answer due 6/6/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/8/2018. (lih) |
||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Thu 05/03 11:36 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 6, 2018 - filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 04/03 12:44 PM
SO ORDERED- re7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. answer due 5/7/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/3/2018. (lih) |
||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Thu 03/29 4:40 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint to May 7, 2018 - filed by Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/27 1:34 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason P. Mueller, Michelle Chatelain Fullmer, Chris P. Perque and Maia T. Woodhouse - filed by CAP-XX, Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Rovner, Philip) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 03/27 3:20 PM
SO ORDERED- re6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason P. Mueller, Michelle Chatelain Fullmer, Chris P. Perque and Maia T. Woodhouse. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/27/2018. (lih) |
||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/16 12:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAP-XX, Ltd.. Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Choa, Jonathan) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/16 11:49 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. on 3/16/2018. (sar) |
||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 03/13 3:52 PM
**NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Magistrate Judge Fallons jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Fallon consistent with 28 U.S.C. § 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge.** (lih) |
||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned (Vacant Judgeship 2017)
Thu 03/08 2:57 PM
Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge (Vacant Judgeship 2017)
Thu 03/08 2:57 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb) |
||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Tue 03/06 12:49 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CAP-XX, Ltd.. (Rovner, Philip) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Tue 03/06 12:43 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,920,034 B2; 7,382,600 B2. (nmfn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Tue 03/06 12:41 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmfn) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/06 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2335897.) - filed by CAP-XX, Ltd.(nmfn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-B, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
No Summons Issued
Tue 03/06 12:46 PM
No Summons Issued. (nmfn) |