KHALIL v. CITY OF PATERSON et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Evelyn Padin |
Referred: | Jessica S Allen |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03241 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Feb 07, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 02, 2018 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
CITY OF PATERSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOSEPH DELGADO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOE CORPORATIONS 1-5
|
|
Defendant
DOE OFFICERS 1-15
|
|
Defendant
OFFICER NUMBER 1
|
|
Defendant
PATERSON POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELIZABETH STRAUB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM FRAHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MOHAMED KHALIL
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 26 2018
OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/26/2018. (sms) |
|
GPO
Mar 08 2023
OPINION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 3/8/2023. (sm) |
1. | Paterson man accuses city police of brutality in federal lawsuit (northjersey.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/21/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |