Lawrence Young v. AETNA Health Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Gardephe |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02068 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 03, 2018 5:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
AETNA Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Young
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/05 3:22 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL:PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, as a result of Plaintiff naming the wrong entity, the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, as to all claims and causes of action asserted therein by Plaintiff against the Defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/5/2018) (cf) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 10/30 12:26 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York, AETNA Health Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York, AETNA Health Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Austin, Earl) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 10/10 4:46 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall apply toDefendants' proposed motion to dismiss: Defendants' motion is due October 31, 2018; Plaintiffs opposition is due November 21, 2018; Defendants' reply, if any, is due November 28, 2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion. (Dkt. No. 16) SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 10/31/2018, Responses due by 11/21/2018, Replies due by 11/28/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/10/2018) (jca) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Opposition Brief
Wed 08/08 2:48 PM
FIRST OPPOSITION BRIEF re:16 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Earl B. Austin dated June 18, 2018. . Document filed by Lawrence Young.(Marks, Bradly) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 07/23 3:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Settlement Conference held on 7/23/2018. (rch) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Thu 07/19 1:21 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Earl B. Austin dated July 19, 2018 re: Electronics Order. Document filed by AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York.(Austin, Earl) |
|
Att: 1 Application to Bring Electronic Devices | ||
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/18 10:43 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:21 Letter filed by Lawrence Young. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/18/2018) (ama) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Mon 07/16 7:20 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Plaintiff dated 7/16/18 re: Request to Appear telephonically. Document filed by Lawrence Young.(Marks, Bradly) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 06/26 4:23 PM
ORDER: granting19 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. Submissions due July 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 7/23/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/26/2018) (ama) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 06/26 2:59 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Earl B. Austin dated June 26, 2018. Document filed by AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York.(Austin, Earl) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/22 12:01 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for Friday, July 6 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6-B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. All persons attending the conference must arrive at least fifteen minutes beforehand to allow for the time required to pass through the security process. Counsel must read the Court's "Standing Order Applicable to Settlement Conferences Before Judge Gorenstein," which is attached and is incorporated herein by reference. Upon receipt of this Order, each counsel is directed to confirm with all other counsel that they have received a copy of this Order. The parties should also note that paragraph 3 of the Standing Order requires certain written submissions, which must be received by the Court and opposing counsel no later than midnight four business days before the conference: that is, June 29 2018. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 7/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/22/2018) (ama) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/21 5:46 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall send a joint letter by July 23, 2018, updating the Court on settlement discussions. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/21/2018) (cf) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 06/21 11:50 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/21/2018. (Court Reporter Thomas Murray) (mr) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Conference
Mon 06/18 4:07 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Earl B. Austin dated June 18, 2018. Document filed by AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York.(Austin, Earl) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Pre-Conference Statement
Fri 06/15 10:19 AM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT . Document filed by Lawrence Young.(Marks, Bradly) |
|
Att: 1 Case Management Plan | ||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 05/21 10:14 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for June 7, 2018 is adjourned to June 21, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Initial Conference set for 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/17/2018) (ras) |
|
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/21 10:02 AM
JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that Aetna will answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before June 2018. (AETNA Health Inc. answer due 6/18/2018; AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York answer due 6/18/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/17/2018) (ras) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/17 5:19 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York. Document filed by AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York.(Austin, Earl) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 05/16 4:00 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Earl B. Austin dated May 16, 2018. Document filed by AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York.(Austin, Earl) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 04/03 11:30 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, that Aetna will answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before May 18, 2018. (AETNA Health Inc. answer due 5/18/2018; AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York answer due 5/18/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/2/2018) (jwh) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 04/03 11:24 AM
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by Lawrence Young.(Marks, Bradly) Modified on 4/3/2018 (ldi) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 03/30 10:18 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. AETNA Health Inc. served on 3/22/2018, answer due 4/12/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougerty, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Lawrence Young. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/29 3:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by Lawrence Young.(Marks, Bradly) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 03/23 4:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York served on 3/21/2018, answer due 4/11/2018. Service was accepted by Dora Lewis, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Lawrence Young. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/08 3:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York. (jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 03/08 12:24 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bradly Gurion Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lawrence Young; AETNA Health Insurance Company of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 03/08 12:26 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 03/08 12:27 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 03/08 12:28 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 03/07 3:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AETNA HEALTH INC. AND AETNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by LAWRENCE YOUNG AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHER PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 03/07 3:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/07 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against AETNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, AETNA Health Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14782187)Document filed by LAWRENCE YOUNG AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHER PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED.(Marks, Bradly) |