Sudac v. Berryhill
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Janet C Hall |
Referred: | Sarah A L Merriam |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00410 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405dc Review of SSA Decision SSDC - Concurrent Title II and Title XVI Claims |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration
|
|
Plaintiff
David Paul Sudac
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 08/13 10:55 AM
ORDER terminating as moot30 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by David Paul Sudac. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2019. (DeRubeis, B.) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order
Tue 08/13 10:52 AM
ORDER granting31 STIPULATION re30 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Nancy A. Berryhill. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2019.(DeRubeis, B.) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/06 7:21 AM
STIPULATION re30 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Abraham, Benil) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 07/23 2:45 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees by David Paul Sudac.Responses due by 8/13/2019(Buckley, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Judgment
Thu 04/25 11:10 AM
JUDGMENT. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2019 |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Thu 04/25 11:11 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
21
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner
Thu 04/25 9:50 AM
RULING granting25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying27 Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner. The case is remanded to the ALJ for proceedings consistent with this Ruling. The Clerks Office is instructed that, if any party appeals to this court the decision made after this remand, any subsequent social security appeal is to be assigned to the District Judge who issued this Ruling. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/24/2019. |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner
Mon 11/05 12:44 PM
MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner by Nancy A. Berryhill.Responses due by 11/20/2018(Abraham, Benil) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts | ||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/18 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benil Abraham on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Abraham, Benil) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/20 4:33 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Government's Motion to Affirm due by 11/5/2018. (Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2018) (DeRubeis, B.) |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 09/04 11:37 PM
First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by David Paul Sudac.Responses due by 9/25/2018(Buckley, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/03 11:06 AM
ORDER granting23 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2018 to file Dispositive Motion and Memorandum Of Law by David Paul Sudac. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/3/2018. (DeRubeis, B.) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/03 11:07 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2018 (DeRubeis, B.) |
||
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 08/01 4:40 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2018 to file Dispositive Motion and Memorandum Of Law by David Paul Sudac. (Buckley, Melissa) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/04 1:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Government having filed its answer and the administrative record (Doc. No. 19), the court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and a supporting memorandum of law on or before AUGUST 3, 2018 . Defendant shall file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand on or before OCTOBER 2 2018 . Plaintiff may file a reply brief pursuant to Local Rule 7(d) on or before OCTOBER 16, 2018 . Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, counsel are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Scheduling Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. (Doc. No. 5.) The parties should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. To expedite the courts consideration of these motions, counsel for the parties must confer to prepare a Stipulation of Facts based on the administrative record. The Stipulation of Facts shall contain page citations to the administrative record and be filed as a separate document contemporaneously with the plaintiffs motion, on or before AUGUST 3, 2018 . In the unusual case in which some factual disputes remain, plaintiff shall file as an exhibit to her motion a statement containing those remaining disputed facts, again with specific citations to the record. Counsel for plaintiff must also provide the court with an affidavit detailing the efforts made to reach agreement as to the material facts. Unless defendant files a motion for voluntary remand, defendant shall file, as an exhibit to its motion, a response to plaintiffs statement containing disputed facts, either (1) agreeing with the statement as presented or (2) disagreeing with the statement or (3) indicating any material omissions. Once again, any submission must contain specific citations to the record supporting each assertion in the statement. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Requests for extensions of these deadlines are discouraged and, unless unusual circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should not seek an extension of greater than 30 days. Any motion for extension of a deadline must include a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three days before the existing deadline. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/4/2018. (Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2018)(DeRubeis, B.) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/01 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Fishman on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (in substitution for David L. Brown) (Fishman, Emily) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/01 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Nancy A. Berryhill of substitution of counsel for David L. Brown by Emily M. Fishman (Fishman, Emily) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer with Transcripts - Social Security Case
Fri 06/01 9:47 AM
ANSWER with Transcripts by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Brown, David) |
|
Att: 1 AR-Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 AR-Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 AR-Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 AR-Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 AR-Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 AR-Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 AR-Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 AR-Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 AR-Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 05/08 2:22 PM
ORDER granting17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2018 to file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill. The court does not expect further requests to extend this deadline. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/8/2018. (DeRubeis, B.) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/04 3:17 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2018 to file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Brown, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order of Transfer
Wed 05/02 9:32 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/26 10:41 AM
NOTICE by Nancy A. Berryhill of Consent to Magistrate (Brown, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order of Transfer
Tue 04/24 2:33 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam as referral Magistrate Judge. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/12 8:03 AM
REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/11 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Brown on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Brown, David) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/12 10:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Paul Sudac. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/12/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. Service made by Clerk via email. (Campbell, A) |
|
10 | 10
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 03/12 10:05 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nancy A. Berryhill* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melissa A. Buckley* *Buckley & Buckley* *234 Church St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Campbell, A) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/09 11:28 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/9/18. (Margolis, Joan) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Electronic Service Documents
Thu 03/08 3:09 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of6 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint filed by David Paul Sudac,3 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals,7 Notice re: Statistical Information,4 Notice re: Assignment of Social Security Appeals,2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Paul Sudac,5 Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice
Thu 03/08 3:08 PM
NOTICE re: Statistical Information Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
6 | 6
order
Electronic Filing Order
Thu 03/08 3:07 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/8/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/08 3:06 PM
Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/8/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice
Thu 03/08 3:05 PM
Notice re: Assignment of Social Security Appeals Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/08 3:04 PM
Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/8/2018.(Anastasio, F.) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/08 11:01 AM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Paul Sudac.(Buckley, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/08 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by David Paul Sudac.(Buckley, Melissa) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/08 3:00 PM
Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Joan G. Margolis added. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Anastasio, F.) |