Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Mark E Walker
Referred: Charles A Stampelos
Case #: 4:18-cv-00137
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2018
Last checked: Monday Apr 23, 2018 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
PAM BONDI
IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF FLORIDA Office of Attorney General, State of Florida The Capitol - PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399
Represented By
EDWARD M WENGER
Office Of The Attorney General - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
AMIT AGARWAL
Office Of The Attorney General - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
RICK SWEARINGEN
Tallahassee, FL 32308
Represented By
EDWARD M WENGER
Office Of The Attorney General - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
AMIT AGARWAL
Office Of The Attorney General - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION
11250 Waples Mill Rd.
Fairfax, VA 22030
Represented By
KENNETH WAYNE SUKHIA
Sukhia Law Group - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
CLIFFORD VINCENT LOCURTO
Locurto Law Firm Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info


1. NRA files lawsuit over Florida's new gun law (reuters.com)
Submitted Mon 03/12/2018
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
44 44 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 2:13 PM
ORDER DENYING 43 MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/13/2018. (tdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
43 43 motion Reconsideration Tue 11:17 AM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Motion for Reconsideration by MITCHELL WILLIAMS (tdl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
42 42 misc Letter Thu 1:38 PM
Letter from JOHN T. PRICE (tdl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
41 41 misc Letter Tue 8:26 AM
Letter from JOHN T. PRICE (tdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
40 40 appeal Transcript Request Appeal Part I Fri 10:04 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION for proceedings held on N/A before Judge N/A, (THOMPSON, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
39 39 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 8:24 AM
USCA Case Number 18-12081 K for34 NOTICE OF APPEAL. (tdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
38 38 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 2:15 PM
ORDER ON JOINT MOTION REQUESTING ABEYANCE - Assuming that this Court is not already divested of jurisdiction, the parties' joint motion requesting that this case be held in abeyance, ECF No. 37 , is GRANTED. All deadlines in this case are stayed pending the resolution of Plaintiff's appeal of this Court's order denying Plaintiff's motion to proceed under pseudonyms (Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 6/18/2018 ). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/18/2018. (vkm)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Stay Fri 12:01 PM
MOTION to Stay JOINT Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Appeal by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
36 36 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 6:46 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re34 Notice of Appeal. (tdl)
Related: [-]
35 35 appeal Appeal Instructions Fri 6:29 AM
Appeal Instructions re:34 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 6/1/2018 . (tdl)
Related: [-]
appeal ~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines Fri 6:47 AM
Set Deadlines re34 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 8/20/2018 . Electronic Availability of ROA due by 8/20/2018 . (tdl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
34 34 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-4183097.) (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
33 33 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appeal from Order by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Sunday, May 13, 2018
32 32 17 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Sun 4:06 PM
ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS. The NRA must file its amended complaint -without pseudonyms-no later than May 21, 2018. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2018 .). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/13/18. (pll)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10:37 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed under Pseudonyms ,19 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 8:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED 29 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY Related [+] Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/7/2018. (tdl)
Related: [-] ply due by 5/11/2018 .
Sunday, May 06, 2018
29 29 motion Leave to File Document Sun 2:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Regarding Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 7:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed under Pseudonyms ,19 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by PAM BONDI, RICK SWEARINGEN. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID HENRY THOMPSON on behalf of NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (THOMPSON, DAVID)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVIS COOPER on behalf of NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (COOPER, DAVIS)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12:42 PM
ORDER ADMITTING JOHN C. OHLENDORF PRO HAC VICE re ECF No. 24 . The motion is GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/2/2018. (tdl)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11:31 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Ohlendorf.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4169960.) by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (OHLENDORF, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, April 30, 2018
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 9:31 AM
ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/30/2018. (tdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
22 22 motion Reconsideration Mon 7:24 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion to Intervene by MITCHELL WILLIAMS. (tdl)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10:48 AM
ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE Related [+] Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/27/2018. (tdl)
Related: [-] sponse to 19 motion due by by 5/4/2018 .
Thursday, April 26, 2018
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 3:31 PM
Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed under Pseudonyms by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH) Modified on 4/28/2018 (pll).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jane Doe,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of John Doe,
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Marion Hammer
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 3:19 PM
MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend Thu 3:14 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
Monday, April 23, 2018
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 8:57 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/7/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/6/2018 . Discovery due by 8/21/2018 . Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/23/2018. (tdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
16 16 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF FILING EXECUTED WAIVER OF SERVICE by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M WENGER on behalf of All Defendants (WENGER, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by AMIT AGARWAL on behalf of All Defendants (AGARWAL, AMIT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Wed 7:34 AM
ORDER DENYING 12 MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/4/2018. (tdl) **Order forwarded**
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
12 12 motion Intervene Tue 12:15 PM
PROPOSED INTERVENOR'S MOTION to Amend his Intervention by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (tdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 1:31 PM
ORDER DENYING 9 LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF - Mr. Leonard separately moves this Court to direct the Clerk to forward him paper copies of the filings in this case. ECF No. 10 . That motion is also DENIED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/30/2018. (tdl)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12:41 PM
MOTION for Paper Copies of Pleadings STEPHEN D LEONARD #15017162. (tdl)
Related: [-]
9 9 8 pgs motion Leave to File Document Fri 12:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by STEPHEN D LEONARD #15017162. (tdl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Wed 10:34 AM
ORDER DENYING 7 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/21/2018. (tdl) **Order Mailed**
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
7 7 8 pgs motion Intervene Tue 9:42 AM
MOTION to Intervene of Mitchell Williams Statement of the Facts by MITCHELL WILLIAMS. (tdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 7:28 PM
Summons Issued as to PAM BONDI, RICK SWEARINGEN. (pll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
5 5 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 5:02 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION as to RICK SWEARINGEN. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD) Modified on 3/9/2018 (pll).
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 5:00 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION as to PAM BONDI. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD) Modified on 3/9/2018 (pll).
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 4:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 4:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Attorney Disclosure
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4118013.), filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]