Trustees Of The Mosaic and Terrazzo Welfare, Pension, Annuity, and Vacation Funds et al v. Elite Terrazzo Flooring, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carol Bagley Amon |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01471 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 05, 2018 5:11 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Picnic Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Elite Terrazzo Flooring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
William Zonca
|
|
Counter Defendant
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Trustees Of The Mosaic and Terrazzo Welfare, Pension, Annuity, and Vacation Funds
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Picnic Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Elite Terrazzo Flooring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Marble Terrazzo and Specialty Contractors Inc.
|
|
Counter Defendant
Local 7 Mossaic & Terrazzo and Chemical Product Finisher Mason Workers Association
|
|
Counter Defendant
Michael Magnam
|
|
Defendant
Michael Magnam
32 Cortland Street
Mount Vernon, NY 10550 |
|
Defendant
William Zonca
|
|
Defendant
Marble Terrazzo and Specialty Contractors Inc.
45-34 Court Square
Long Island City, NY 11101 |
|
Defendant
Elite Terrazzo Flooring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Local 7 Mossaic & Terrazzo and Chemical Product Finisher Mason Workers Association
45-34 Court Square
Long Island City, NY 11101 |
|
Defendant
Picnic Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees Of The Mosaic and Terrazzo Welfare, Pension, Annuity, and Vacation Funds
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Michael Magnam
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Marble Terrazzo and Specialty Contractors Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Local 7 Mossaic & Terrazzo and Chemical Product Finisher Mason Workers Association
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Picnic Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Elite Terrazzo Flooring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Trustees Of The Mosaic and Terrazzo Welfare, Pension, Annuity, and Vacation Funds
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
William Zonca
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Elite Terrazzo Flooring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Picnic Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
122 | 122
order
Judgment
Thu 08/31 5:01 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the March 30, 2021 judgment is corrected and entered in favor of the Plaintiffs and against Defendants as follows: Ordering Defendant Picnic Worldwide LLC to submit to an audit of its books and payroll records for the period beginning May 19, 2017 through the present within 30 days of entry of this Order; Awarding judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs and against Defendants in the amount of $694,645.08, representing the unpaid settlement payments; Awarding Plaintiffs $883.92 in attorneys' fees and costs arising out of this proceeding; (see judgment for details). Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/31/2023. (EF) |
|
121 | 121
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Thu 08/31 4:28 PM
ORDER and Corrected Judgment granting118 Motion to Alter Judgment: The March 30, 2021 judgment is corrected to specify the amount of the monetary award to Plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/31/2023. (EF) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
120 | 120
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/24 1:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trustees Of The Mosaic and Terrazzo Welfare, Pension, Annuity, and Vacation Funds, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund re118 MOTION to Alter Judgment entered March 30, 2021, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) ,119 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, upon Defendants, Elite Terrazzo Flooring, Inc. and Picnic Worldwide LLC (Grancio, Adrianna) |