Irene Morales v. Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01977 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 05, 2018 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Irene Morales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 05/17 1:37 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez,12 . The court has considered the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. The court finds that the Voluntary Dismissal should be GRANTED. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice, from this action. Each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (pso) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Mon 05/14 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Irene Morales pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) With Prejudice as to Capital One Bank USA, N.A..(Brazier, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Settlement
Wed 04/04 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Irene Morales. (Brazier, Brian) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
attorney
Change of Address
Fri 03/30 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Brian James Brazier attorney for Plaintiff Irene Morales. Changing attorneys address to 8245 N. 85th Way, Scottsdale, AZ 85258. Filed by Plaintiff Irene Morales. (Brazier, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/15 1:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Irene Morales, upon Defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A. served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenya Bracey Admin Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brazier, Brian) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/12 9:45 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/09 2:56 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/09 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/09 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/09 10:18 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Irene Morales. (Brazier, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/09 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Irene Morales, (Brazier, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/09 10:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Irene Morales. (Brazier, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/09 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21384751 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Irene Morales. (Attorney Brian James Brazier added to party Irene Morales(pty:pla))(Brazier, Brian) |