Pacific Harbor Line Inc v. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00483 |
Nature of Suit | 740 Labor - Railway Labor Act |
Cause | 45:151 Railway Labor Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 05, 2018 1:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Lawrence Zakson
|
|
Plaintiff
Pacific Harbor Line Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 09/04 10:32 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice42 . Made JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) |
|
42 | 42
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/30 2:57 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc.(Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/24 7:50 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Dispositive Motion and Trial Date Deadline40 . Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2019., Trial continued to 10/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 10/7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
stip
Continue
Wed 05/22 11:21 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue DISPOSITIVE MOTION AND TRIAL DEADLINES from 6/24/2019; 8/5/2019 and 8/20/2019 to 8/26/2019; 10/07/2019 AND 10/21/2019 Re: Order,, Set/Reset Hearing,39 filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc.(Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/03 2:40 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Request Continuation of Dispositive Motion and Trial Deadlines38 . The Dispositive Motion Hearing Cut-Off is continued to 6/24/19. Trial continued to 8/20/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 8/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
stip
Continue
Thu 03/28 2:00 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue DISPOSITIVE MOTION AND TRIAL DEADLINES from 4/29/2019; 6/10/2019 AND 6/25/2019 to 6/24/2019; 8/05/2019 AND 8/19/2019 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,31 filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc.(Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 02/26 9:26 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation Requesting Cancellation of the Mediation and Continuance of the Mediation Completion Date36 . The mediation scheduled for February 28, 2019 is taken off calendar. The mediation completion date is continued to June 3, 2019. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
stip
Vacate
Thu 02/21 4:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Mediation Notice of Mediation Date(ADR-13)35 Requesting Cancellation of the Mediation filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc.(Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Thu 01/17 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for February 28, 2019.(Zakson, Laurence) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Mon 07/16 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Lawrence Zakson has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Assigned) - (ADR-2)
Thu 07/12 10:51 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: Labor. Filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc(Schloss, Craig) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Fri 06/22 11:57 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 11, 2019. (es) |
|
31 | 31
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Fri 06/22 11:29 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2018. Discovery cut-off (last day to hear discovery motions) 2/11/2019. Motions cut-off (Last day to hear Dispositive Motions) by 4/29/2019. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Bench Trial set for 6/25/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (jlo) |
|
30 | 30
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Fri 06/22 10:59 AM
The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for June 25, 201826 . The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jlo) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Leave to Appear
Wed 06/20 3:06 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, GRANTING Joint Request to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference.28 (es) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Appear
Fri 06/15 9:55 AM
Joint REQUEST for Leave of Lead Counsel to Appear for Telephonic Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. Request set for hearing on 6/25/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Report
Mon 06/11 1:28 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/12 2:52 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 04/09 10:05 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gga) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/09 9:59 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting21 Non-Resident Attorney Michael P Persoon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Western Lines and Pacific Harbor Lines, designating Carol Sobel as local counsel. (ad) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/06 6:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines.(Sobel, Carol) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 04/05 11:14 AM
APPLICATION to AMEND APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael P. Persoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee21 filed by defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines. (Sobel, Carol) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 04/05 10:15 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael P. Persoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines (Pro Hac Vice Fee - F ee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21534031) filed by defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines. (Attorney Carol A Sobel added to party Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines (pty:dft)) (Sobel, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/23 10:35 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc, upon Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doreen Corfman - Secretary authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned.(Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Executed Proof of Service of Summons | ||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Mon 03/19 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21417282)16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21417158)15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lom) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/19 1:08 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting16 Non-Resident Attorney Robert S Hawkins APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc, designating Craig A Schloss as local counsel. (ad) |
|
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/19 1:06 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J Rolfes APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc, designating Craig A Schloss as local counsel. (ad) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 03/15 12:29 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21417282) filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 03/15 12:22 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21417158) filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/14 4:18 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
13 | 13
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/14 4:17 PM
(STRICKEN) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) Modified on 3/14/2018 (ima) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/13 1:33 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen General Committee of Adjustment, Union Pacific Railroad Western Lines. (dro) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Tue 03/13 9:59 AM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. Exhibit A as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 .(Schloss, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/12 4:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 03/12 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert S Hawkins. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 03/12 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J Rolfes. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Mon 03/12 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: Wrong name of court please put Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/12 4:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/12 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/09 4:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc identifying Anacostia Rail Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/09 4:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/09 4:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. (Schloss, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/09 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21389322 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Pacific Harbor Line Inc. (Attorney Craig A Schloss added to party Pacific Harbor Line Inc(pty:pla))(Schloss, Craig) |